Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994849

EP0994849 - METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF 2,4,5-TRIFLUOROBENZONITRILE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.08.2003  [2003/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HUPPERTS, Achim
Friedrichstrasse 71
D-40217 Düsseldorf / DE
02 / LANTZSCH, Reinhard
Am Buschhäuschen 51
D-42115 Wuppertal / DE
[2000/17]
Application number, filing date98932174.018.06.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998EP03732
Priority number, dateDE199712789001.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19727890
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901425
Date:14.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994849
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994849
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07C253/00, C07C255/50
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2,4,5-TRIFLUOR-BENZONITRIL[2000/17]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF 2,4,5-TRIFLUOROBENZONITRILE[2000/17]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE 2,4,5-TRIFLUOROBENZONITRILE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase01.02.2000National basic fee paid 
01.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
01.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
17.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2002Fee for grant paid
07.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0682008  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-6,8-10 * siehe Seite 6, Zeilen 6-19; Beispiele 4, *;
 [A]FR2632648  (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1,3,5-10 * siehe Seite 9, Zeilen 5-31 *;
 [AD]GB1131501  (IMP SMELTING CORP LTD) [AD] 1 * example 2 *;
 [AD]EP0191185  (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO [JP]) [AD] 1 * page 15 *
 [A]  - HOUBEN-WEYL Methoden der Organischen Chemie, 4. Auflage, Band X/3, Teil 3, STUTTGART, DE, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, XP002081804 [A] 1,8,9 * page 30 - page 31 *