Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990284

EP0990284 - PHASE-CONJUGATION LASER MIRROR WITH FOUR-WAVE MIXING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ouhayoun, Michel
27, rue de la Cerisaie
75004 Paris / FR
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/14]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2003/16]
Former [2000/14]Bloch, Gérard
2, square de l'Avenue du Bois
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98932210.216.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998FR01257
Priority number, dateFR1997000748317.06.1997         Original published format: FR 9707483
[2000/14]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858429
Date:23.12.1998
Language:FR
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990284
Date:05.04.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990284
Date:16.06.2004
Language:FR
[2004/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01S3/10
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/14]
TitleGerman:LASER MIT PHASENKONJUGATIONSSPIEGEL UNTER VERWENDUNG VON VIERWELLENMISCHUNG[2002/46]
English:PHASE-CONJUGATION LASER MIRROR WITH FOUR-WAVE MIXING[2000/14]
French:LASER A MIROIR A CONJUGAISON DE PHASE PAR MELANGE A QUATRE ONDES[2000/14]
Former [2000/14]LASER MIT PHASENKONJUGATIONSSPIEGEL UNTER VERWENDUND VON VIERWELLENMISCHUNG
Entry into regional phase15.12.1999National basic fee paid 
15.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
07.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2003Fee for grant paid
29.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)17.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23]
Request for further processing for:11.08.2003Request for further processing filed
11.08.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.08.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200306   M06   Fee paid on   07.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO9525367  (SECR DEFENCE [GB], et al) [X] 1 * figure 3; claim 3 * [A] 2-5,7;
 [A]FR2574224  (TELECOMMUNICATIONS SA [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [D]US4233571  (WANG VICTOR, et al)
 [X]  - MOCHALOV G T ET AL, "EMISSION OF SOLID-STATE LASERS WITH A SELF-PUMPED PHASE-CONJUGATION RESONATOR", OPTICS AND SPECTROSCOPY, (198809), vol. 65, no. 3, page 302, XP000037616 [X] 1-6,16,17 * the whole document *
 [X]  - KIREEV S E ET AL, "Copper vapor laser with a wavefront-reversing mirror induced in the active medium", KVANTOVAYA ELEKTRONIKA, MOSKVA, APRIL 1986, USSR, ISSN 0368-7147, vol. 13, no. 4, pages 866 - 868, XP002058282 [X] 1,2,11,16,17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1070/QE1986v016n04ABEH006559