blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0990122 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0990122



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 449
06.08.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
16.05.2006 Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore Search / examination 1
03.05.2006 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 2
04.02.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
19.02.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.02.2004 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
30.10.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.10.2003 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
07.10.2003 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
29.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 1
29.09.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.09.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 15
29.09.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 11
21.08.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) Search / examination 1
11.08.2003 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
17.04.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.04.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
17.04.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 92
09.12.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
09.12.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.08.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
29.08.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.08.2001 Claims Search / examination 14
27.08.2001 Description Search / examination 1
27.08.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.08.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 17
26.06.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.06.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.02.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
16.02.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.08.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
12.07.2000 Request for change of name Search / examination 3
23.02.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.02.2000 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 2
22.02.2000 Priority document Search / examination 42
11.02.2000 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
11.02.2000 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
03.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.12.1999 Claims Search / examination 11
17.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 2
10.11.1999 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
29.09.1999 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
03.09.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 16
09.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
07.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 34
07.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 38
11.12.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
11.12.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 99