blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0990122


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.04.2008  [2008/16]
23.03.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.04.2007  [2007/17]
10.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2006  [2006/13]
29.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2005  [2005/24]
22.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2005  [2005/23]
18.03.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.05.2005  [2005/18]
04.02.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  23.03.2005  [2005/12]
28.01.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2005  [2005/11]
26.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.01.2005  [2005/02]
19.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.01.2005  [2005/01]
29.10.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.12.2004  [2004/51]
03.09.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.10.2004  [2004/43]
20.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.10.2004  [2004/41]
13.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.09.2004  [2004/40]
13.02.2004 (Expected) grant published on  31.03.2004  [2004/14]
04.09.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
04.09.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
28.08.2003 Deletion: Payment of fee for grant
28.08.2003 Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
27.08.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
27.08.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
03.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.04.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.01.2003 Change - German title published on  26.02.2003  [2003/09]
28.12.2002 Change - German title published on  12.02.2003  [2003/07]
13.12.2002 Examination report or reply
23.08.2002 Examination report or reply
10.07.2002 Renewal fee
04.09.2001 Examination report or reply
02.07.2001 Renewal fee
20.06.2001 Examination report or reply
16.02.2001 First examination report
13.02.2001 Examination report or reply
04.08.2000 Change - applicant published on  20.09.2000 [2000/38]
28.06.2000 Renewal fee
18.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
18.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
01.02.2000 Change - extension states
27.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
02.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
18.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
04.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
23.12.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
13.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication