blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0990122 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP95918680 EP98932269 EP99973143



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9531696Global Dossier 23.11.1995A1
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9423861 25.11.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0033244Global Dossier 09.11.2000A3
WO0033244 08.06.2000A2
Priority number Date
GB9826139 27.11.1998
GB9918298 03.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7030782Global Dossier 18.04.2006B2
US2004169594 02.09.2004A1
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
US62742300 27.07.2000
GB9713221 23.06.1997
US27898402 24.10.2002
GB9712735 17.06.1997
US11188598 08.07.1998
US79616404 10.03.2004
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
US73750596 12.12.1996
GB9501095 15.05.1995
GB9423861 25.11.1994
GB9725133 27.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002531902Global Dossier 24.09.2002A
Priority number Date
GB9826139 27.11.1998
GB9918298 03.08.1999
GB9903989 29.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4173917BGlobal Dossier 29.10.2008B2
JP2002508060 12.03.2002A
Priority number Date
GB9713221 23.06.1997
GB9712735 17.06.1997
GB9725133 27.11.1997
GB9801759 17.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3804971BGlobal Dossier 02.08.2006B2
JPH10500481 13.01.1998A
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9501095 15.05.1995
GB9423861 25.11.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1135745Global Dossier 24.09.2003B1
EP1135745 26.09.2001A2
Priority number Date
GB9826139 27.11.1998
GB9918298 03.08.1999
GB9903989 29.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0760087Global Dossier 05.01.2005B9
EP0760087 21.04.2004B2
EP0760087 29.04.1998B1
EP0760087 05.03.1997A1
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9501095 15.05.1995
GB9423861 25.11.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0990122Global Dossier 31.03.2004B1
EP0990122 05.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
GB9713221 23.06.1997
GB9712735 17.06.1997
GB9725133 27.11.1997
GB9801759 17.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT165659T 15.05.1998T
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9423861 25.11.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT250784T 15.10.2003T
Priority number Date
GB9826139 27.11.1998
GB9918298 03.08.1999
GB9903989 29.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT263359T 15.04.2004T
Priority number Date
GB9713221 23.06.1997
GB9712735 17.06.1997
GB9725133 27.11.1997
GB9801759 17.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU679378B 26.06.1997B2
AU2451395 05.12.1995A
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9501095 15.05.1995
GB9423861 25.11.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU748524B 06.06.2002B2
AU8222598 04.01.1999A
Priority number Date
GB9713221 23.06.1997
GB9712735 17.06.1997
GB9725133 27.11.1997
GB9801759 17.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU769964B 12.02.2004B2
AU1397700 19.06.2000A
Priority number Date
GB9826139 27.11.1998
GB9918298 03.08.1999
GB9903989 29.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9507650 09.09.1997A
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9501095 15.05.1995
GB9423861 25.11.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2189959 15.11.2005C
CA2189959 23.11.1995A1
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9501095 15.05.1995
GB9423861 25.11.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2295047 09.05.2006C
CA2295047 23.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
GB9713221 23.06.1997
GB9712735 17.06.1997
GB9725133 27.11.1997
GB9801759 17.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2352363 08.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
GB9826139 27.11.1998
GB9918298 03.08.1999
GB9903989 29.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1085332C 22.05.2002C
CN1152954 25.06.1997A
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9423861 25.11.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69502283D 04.06.1998D1
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9501095 15.05.1995
GB9423861 25.11.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69502283T 18.11.2004T3
DE69502283T 05.11.1998T2
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9501095 15.05.1995
GB9423861 25.11.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69822828T 12.08.2004T2
DE69822828D 06.05.2004D1
Priority number Date
GB9713221 23.06.1997
GB9712735 17.06.1997
GB9725133 27.11.1997
GB9801759 17.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69911641T 05.08.2004T2
DE69911641D 30.10.2003D1
Priority number Date
GB9826139 27.11.1998
GB9918298 03.08.1999
GB9903989 29.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0760087T 09.08.2004T4
DK0760087T 22.02.1999T3
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9501095 15.05.1995
GB9423861 25.11.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2115382T 01.12.2004T5
ES2115382T 16.06.1998T3
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9423861 25.11.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB9408948D 22.06.1994D0
Priority number Date
GB9408948 05.05.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB9409711D 06.07.1994D0
Priority number Date
GB9409711 14.05.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB9417353D 19.10.1994D0
Priority number Date
GB9409711 14.05.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB9420597D 30.11.1994D0
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9408948 05.05.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB9423861D 11.01.1995D0
Priority number Date
GB9423861 25.11.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB9712735D 20.08.1997D0
Priority number Date
GB9712735 17.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB9713221D 27.08.1997D0
Priority number Date
GB9713221 23.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB9725133D 28.01.1998D0
Priority number Date
GB9725133 27.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB9826139D 20.01.1999D0
Priority number Date
GB9826139 27.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB9918298D 06.10.1999D0
Priority number Date
GB9918298 03.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1010796 25.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9501095 15.05.1995
GB9423861 25.11.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1027619 03.09.2004A1
Priority number Date
GB9713221 23.06.1997
GB9712735 17.06.1997
GB9725133 27.11.1997
GB9801759 17.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1040795 24.12.2003A1
Priority number Date
GB9826139 27.11.1998
GB9918298 03.08.1999
GB9903989 29.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX9605535 28.02.1998A
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9501095 15.05.1995
GB9423861 25.11.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MXPA01005267 24.04.2002A
Priority number Date
GB9826139 27.11.1998
GB9918298 03.08.1999
GB9903989 29.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI0760087T 31.10.1998T1
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9501095 15.05.1995
GB9423861 25.11.1994
EP95918680 15.05.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5815091 29.09.1998A
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9501095 15.05.1995
GB9423861 25.11.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6249234 19.06.2001B1
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
GB9713221 23.06.1997
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9712735 17.06.1997
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9423861 25.11.1994
GB9725133 27.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6489899 03.12.2002B1
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
US62742300 27.07.2000
GB9713221 23.06.1997
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9712735 17.06.1997
GB9420597 03.10.1994
US11188598 08.07.1998
GB9423861 25.11.1994
GB9725133 27.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6667740 23.12.2003B2
US2001001430 24.05.2001A1
Priority number Date
GB9826139 27.11.1998
GB9918298 03.08.1999
GB9903989 29.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6888538 03.05.2005B2
US2002179339 05.12.2002A1
Priority number Date
GB9417353 26.08.1994
US62742300 27.07.2000
GB9713221 23.06.1997
GB9826139 27.11.1998
US75421801 05.01.2001
GB9918298 03.08.1999
GB9712735 17.06.1997
US10826602 28.03.2002
GB9903989 29.11.1999
GB9409711 14.05.1994
GB9420597 03.10.1994
GB9501095 15.05.1995
GB9423861 25.11.1994
GB9725133 27.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2003062889 03.04.2003A1
Priority number Date
US62742300 27.07.2000
US27898402 24.10.2002
US73750596 12.12.1996
US11188598 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9858237Global Dossier 23.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
GB9713221 23.06.1997
GB9712735 17.06.1997
GB9725133 27.11.1997