Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990122

EP0990122 - Detecting relative position and orientation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/14]POSITION DETECTOR
[2003/07]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Synaptics (UK) Limited
Harston Mill Harston
Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Synaptics (UK) Limited
Harston Mill
Harston, Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Absolute Sensors Limited
Harston Mill
Harston, Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / ELY, David, Thomas, Eliot
Scientific Generics Limited Harston Mill
Harston Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB
02 / JONES, Ross, Peter
Scientific Generics Limited Harston Mill
Harston Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB
03 / ENGLAND, James, Mark, Carson
Scientific Generics Limited Harston Mill
Harston Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB
04 / McKINNON, Alexander, Wilson
Scientific Generics Limited Harston Mill
Harston Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB
05 / PETTIGREW, Robert, Martin
Scientific Generics Limited Harston Mill
Harston Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB
06 / DAMES, Andrew, Nicholas
74 de Freville Avenue
Cambridge CB4 1HU / GB
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date98932269.817.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998GB01759
Priority number, dateGB1997001273517.06.1997         Original published format: GB 9712735
GB1997001322123.06.1997         Original published format: GB 9713221
GB1997002513327.11.1997         Original published format: GB 9725133
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858237
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990122
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990122
Date:31.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01D5/20, G06K11/16
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
Extension statesAL11.01.2000
LT11.01.2000
LV11.01.2000
MK11.01.2000
RO11.01.2000
SI11.01.2000
TitleGerman:Feststellung von relativer Position und Orientierung[2003/07]
English:Detecting relative position and orientation[2003/07]
French:Détection de position et d'orientation relatives[2003/07]
Former [2000/14]POSITIONSGEBER
Former [2000/14]POSITION DETECTOR
Former [2000/14]DETECTEUR DE POSITION
Entry into regional phase11.01.2000National basic fee paid 
11.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
16.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2003Fee for grant paid
14.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
18.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
CY31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
IT31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
NL31.03.2004
IE17.06.2004
LU17.06.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
PT31.08.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/17]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
CY31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
NL31.03.2004
IE17.06.2004
LU17.06.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
Former [2006/13]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
NL31.03.2004
IE17.06.2004
LU17.06.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
Former [2005/24]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
IE17.06.2004
LU17.06.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
Former [2005/23]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
LU17.06.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
Former [2005/18]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
Former [2005/11]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
MC30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
Former [2005/02]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
Former [2005/01]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/51]AT31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI31.03.2004
SE30.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[XAY]EP0417921  (SONY CORP) [X] 1-6,9,16,17,19,20,22,28,38,40-43,55,58,62,63,66,67 * page 6, line 25 - page 15, line 39; figures 1-13 * [A] 7,8,12,23,24,26,27,32,46,47,53,54,57,59,60 [Y] 33-37,44,45,48,50-52,56,61,64;
 [DYA]WO9531696  (SCIENT GENERICS LTD ;DAMES ANDREW NICHOLAS (GB); ELY DAVID THOMAS) [DY] 33-37 * claims 1-4,26 * * the whole document * [A] 1-32,38-67;
 [YA]US4029899  (GORDON JOHN ASHLEY) [Y] 44,45,48,50-52,56,61,64 * column 8, line 58 - line 68; figure 7 * * column 5, line 44 - line 50; figures 2A-2D * [A] 40;
 [A]US5239489  (RUSSELL GREGORY F) [A] 1-67 * the whole document *