Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990091

EP0990091 - DIRECT INJECTION SPARK IGNITION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.03.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.04.2003  [2003/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc.
Suite 911, Parklane Towers East, Parkland Boulevard, Dearborn
Michigan 48136 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/17]For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc.
Suite 911, Parklane Towers East, Parkland Boulevard
Dearborn, Michigan 48136 / US
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc.
Suite 911, Parklane Towers East, One Parklane Boulevard
Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MA, Thomas Tsoi Hei
1 Collingwood Road, South Woodham Ferrers
Chelmsford, Essex CM3 5BY / GB
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Messulam, Alec Moses
A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway
Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB
Application number, filing date98932278.917.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998GB01777
Priority number, dateGB1997001272018.06.1997         Original published format: GB 9712720
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858166
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990091
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990091
Date:02.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:F02B23/08, F02M61/14, // F02M57:06
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/14]
TitleGerman:DIREKTEINGESPRITZTE, FREMDGEZÜNDETE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE[2000/14]
English:DIRECT INJECTION SPARK IGNITION ENGINE[2000/14]
French:MOTEUR A ALLUMAGE COMMANDE ET A INJECTION DIRECTE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase29.11.1999National basic fee paid 
29.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
06.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2002Fee for grant paid
28.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XA]GB2113297  (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [X] 1 [A] 2-3;
 [A]GB1025543  (FORD MOTOR CO) [A] 1-3;
 [AP]US4116191  (YANAGIHARA HIROMICHI, et al) [A] 1-3 [AP] 1-3
ExaminationJPH09209761
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 199, no. 712,