Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991981

EP0991981 - METHOD OF PREPARING A WATER-LESS LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.05.2005
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.07.2005  [2005/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kodak Polychrome Graphics Company Ltd.
401 Merritt 7
Norwalk, CT 06851 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/23]For all designated states
Kodak Polychrome Graphics Company Ltd.
401 Merritt 7
Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Kodak Polychrome Graphics Company Ltd.
401 Merritt 7
Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FIRTH, Deborah, Jane
deceased / GB
02 / SPOWAGE, Mark, John
42 Hillcrest
Swillington, Leeds LS26 8DL / GB
03 / McCULLOUGH, Christopher, David
8 Pasture Close
Sherburn-in-Elmet, Leeds LS25 6LJ / GB
04 / RAY, Kevin, Barry
30 Chalner Avenue
Morley, Leeds LS27 0SD / GB
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Brierley, Anthony Paul , et al
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax
HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Brierley, Anthony Paul , et al
Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road
Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date98932282.122.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998GB01827
Priority number, dateGB1997001341126.06.1997         Original published format: GB 9713411
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900703
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991981
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/016, B41C1/10
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WASSERLOSEN LITHOGRAPHISCHEN DRUCKFORM[2000/15]
English:METHOD OF PREPARING A WATER-LESS LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING FORM[2000/15]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UNE FORME LITHOGRAPHIQUE SANS EAU[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase04.12.1999National basic fee paid 
04.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
29.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/27]
07.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/27]
Request for further processing for:01.10.2003Request for further processing filed
01.10.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.10.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0625728  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 1-24 * page 5, lines 13-15; example 4; claims 1,5,9 *;
 [Y]EP0164128  (FROMSON H A [US]) [Y] 1-24 * page 13, lines 1-7; example 2; claims 1,5,7,8,12 * * page 13, lines 19-23 *;
 [Y]DE2524562  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) [Y] 1-24 * page 6, line 18 - page 8, line 15; claims 1,5 * * page 10, lines 19-25; claim 7 *;
 [Y]EP0770494  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [Y] 1-24 * claims 1-4,9 *;
 [Y]EP0778499  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [Y] 1-24 * page 4, lines 14-18; claims 1,9 * * page 4, lines 42-48 *;
 [YD]US3997349  (SANDERS JAMES F) [YD] 1-24 * claims 1,2,4,8 *;
 [Y]DE2725308  (HOECHST CO AMERICAN) [Y] 1-24 * page 4, line 11 - page 6, line 11; example 2 *;
 [E]WO9832053  (HORSELL GRAPHIC IND LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1-24 * page 3, second paragraph;; examples 1-3; claims 1-10 *;
 [E]WO9831545  (HORSELL GRAPHIC IND LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1-24 * page 4; claims 1-13 *