blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0991981 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0991981



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 118
18.05.2005 Closing of application Search / examination 1
22.04.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
13.04.2005 Request for change of address Search / examination 2
07.02.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
04.08.2004 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
14.10.2003 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
01.10.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
01.10.2003 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
29.04.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
29.04.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.12.1999 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.12.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
04.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
05.10.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
05.07.1999 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
08.06.1999 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
16.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
22.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 28
28.12.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
28.12.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 26
16.11.1998 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
22.06.1998 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
22.06.1998 Claims International Searching Authority 4
22.06.1998 Description International Searching Authority 20