blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0991981


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.05.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  06.07.2005  [2005/27]
22.04.2005 Change - applicant published on  08.06.2005  [2005/23]
01.02.2005 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
30.07.2004 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
04.02.2004 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
10.10.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.10.2003 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
10.10.2003 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
04.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.04.2003 Examination report or reply
25.04.2003 First examination report
10.07.2002 Renewal fee
21.06.2001 Renewal fee
04.07.2000 Renewal fee
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
25.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
20.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
17.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
01.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
11.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication