blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0991981
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0991981Global Dossier 12.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
GB9713411 26.06.1997
GB9801827 22.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU8223298 19.01.1999A
Priority number Date
GB9713411 26.06.1997
GB9801827 22.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6242159 05.06.2001B1
Priority number Date
GB9713411 26.06.1997
GB9801827 22.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9900703Global Dossier 07.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
GB9713411 26.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB9713411D 27.08.1997D0
Priority number Date
GB9713411 26.06.1997