blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0991981

Designated contracting statesDE 
FR 
GB 
SE 
Examination procedure07.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/27]
Entry into regional phase04.12.1999National basic fee paid 
04.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200407   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB SE
 
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19991204
 
Event date:11.06.2003 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20030429
 
Event date:08.06.2005 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:KODAK POLYCHROME GRAPHICS COMPANY LTD.
 
Event date:06.07.2005 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20050104