EP0991951 - A SPECTRUM ANALYSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aeroflex Limited Longacres House Six Hills Way Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2AN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states Aeroflex Limited Longacres House Six Hills Way Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 2AN / GB | ||
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states Aeroflex International Limited Longacres House, Six Hills Way Stevenage, Herts SG1 2AN / GB | ||
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states IFR Limited Longacres House, Norton Green Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2BA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMAS, Neil, Edwin Longacres House, Norton Green Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2BA / GB | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Matthew Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Gillard, Matthew Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2008/35] | Hogg, Jeffery Keith, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2000/15] | Hogg, Jeffery Keith, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 98932291.2 | 24.06.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998GB01868 | Priority number, date | GB19970013305 | 25.06.1997 Original published format: GB 9713305 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9859252 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991951 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0991951 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01R23/16 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
G01R23/18 (EP,US);
G01R23/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2000/15] | Title | German: | SPEKTRALANALYSATOR | [2000/15] | English: | A SPECTRUM ANALYSER | [2000/15] | French: | ANALYSEUR DE SPECTRE | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 03.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.11.2006 | 10.11.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 30.11.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.03.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 12.01.2007 | Appeal received No. T0587/07 | 15.03.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.03.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2000 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4918382 (BALES ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1,15 * abstract * * column 3, line 11 - line 26 ** figure - *; | [A]DE19542247 (ADVANTEST CORP [JP]) [A] 1,15 * abstract * * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 39 * * figures 1,2A,2B *; | [A]US5629703 (LEWALLEN ROY W [US]) [A] 1,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 12 * * figure 6 * |