Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991477

EP0991477 - IMPROVED TARGETING OF FLYING INSECTS WITH INSECTICIDES AND APPARATUS FOR CHARGING LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHAMPTON
Highfield
Southampton S017 1BJ / GB
For all designated states
Reckitt Benckiser (UK) Limited
103-105 Bath Road Slough
Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHAMPTON
Highfield
Southampton S017 1BJ / GB
For all designated states
Reckitt Benckiser (UK) LIMITED
103-105 Bath Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHAMPTON
Highfield
Southampton S017 1BJ / GB
For all designated states
Reckitt & Colman Products Limited
67 Alma Road
Windsor, Berkshire SL4 3HD / GB
Inventor(s)01 / FOX, Rodney, Thomas
30 South Street, Cottingham
Hull HU16 4AS / GB
02 / HARRISON, Neale, Mark
27 Cronwell Close, Tutbury
Burton-on-Trent DE13 9HZ / GB
03 / HUGHES, John, Farrell
2 Shepherds Close, Bartley
Southampton SO40 2LJ / GB
04 / WHITMORE, Lindsey, Faye
60 Pees Farm Road, Colden Common
Winchester S021 1UG / GB
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Dickson, Elizabeth Anne
Reckitt Benckiser plc Group Patents Department, Dansom Lane
Hull HU8 7DS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/02]Dickson, Elizabeth Anne
Reckitt Benckiser plc, Group Patents Department, Dansom Lane
Hull HU8 7DS / GB
Former [2000/15]Allard, Susan Joyce , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date98932311.829.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998GB01898
Priority number, dateGB1997001423104.07.1997         Original published format: GB 9714231
GB1997002261128.10.1997         Original published format: GB 9722611
GB1998000613324.03.1998         Original published format: GB 9806133
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901227
Date:14.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991477
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991477
Date:02.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B05B5/047, B65D83/14
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/15]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTES ZIELEN VON FLIEGENDEN INSEKTEN MIT INSEKTIZIDEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM LADEN VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN[2000/15]
English:IMPROVED TARGETING OF FLYING INSECTS WITH INSECTICIDES AND APPARATUS FOR CHARGING LIQUIDS[2000/15]
French:INSECTICIDES POUVANT AMELIORER LE CIBLAGE D'INSECTES VOLANTS ET APPAREIL DE CHARGEMENT DE LIQUIDES[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase13.12.1999National basic fee paid 
13.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
04.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2002Fee for grant paid
19.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE02.04.2003
CH02.04.2003
LI02.04.2003
NL02.04.2003
GR02.07.2003
[2004/28]
Former [2004/02]CH02.04.2003
LI02.04.2003
NL02.04.2003
GR02.07.2003
Former [2004/01]CH02.04.2003
LI02.04.2003
NL02.04.2003
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO9728883  (UNIV SOUTHAMPTON [GB], et al) [PX] 1-7,18,19 * the whole document *;
 [X]SU1482732  ;
 [A]CH278204  (TRUFFAUT GEORGES [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 4, column 1, line 3 - line 10; figures 1-511-13; claims 5-14 *;
 [X]WO9010505  (GRANT MICHAEL JOHN [AU], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * page 5, line 15 - line 21 * * page 3, line 4 - line 14 *;
 [A]WO9607484  (RECKITT & COLMANN PROD LTD [GB], et al) [A] 7-18 * abstract *;
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, (19900103), vol. 89, no. 46, Database accession no. 89-338598, XP002081478 & SU1482732 A 00000000 (ALMA) [X] 1-7 * abstract *
 [A]  - KLEBER W ET AL, "Triboelectrically charged powder coatings generated by running through holes and slits", JOURNAL OF ELECTROSTATICS, (199706), vol. 40-41, page 237-240, XP004064621 [A] 7,18

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3886(97)00043-0