Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993590

EP0993590 - GERÄT ZUM ABTASTEN EINER OBERFLÄCHE ODER WIEDERGEBEN EINER ABGETASTETEN OBERFLÄCHE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/16]TACTILE SIMULATOR
[2002/03]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.08.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.10.2003  [2003/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MEDICAL RESEARCH COUNCIL
20 Park Crescent
London W1N 4AL / GB
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / WING, Alan Miles
76 Cotton Lane, Mosley
Birmingham B13 9SE / GB
[2000/17]
Former [2000/16]01 / WING, Alan, Miles
80 Thornton Road, Girton
Cambridge CB3 0NN / GB
Representative(s)Morton, Colin David , et al
Nash Matthews
90-92 Regent Street
Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Morton, Colin David , et al
Keith W Nash & Co. Pearl Assurance House 90-92 Regent Street
Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB
Application number, filing date98932343.102.07.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998GB01942
Priority number, dateGB1997001396603.07.1997         Original published format: GB 9713966
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901717
Date:14.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993590
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993590
Date:09.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01D1/00
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
Extension statesLT08.11.1999
LV08.11.1999
TitleGerman:DEVICE FOR SCANNING A SURFACE OR DISPLAYING A SCANNED SURFACE[2002/03]
English:GERÄT ZUM ABTASTEN EINER OBERFLÄCHE ODER WIEDERGEBEN EINER ABGETASTETEN OBERFLÄCHE[2002/03]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR TATER UNE SURFACE OU REPRESENTER UNE SURFACE TATEE[2002/03]
Former [2000/16]TAKTIL SIMULATOR
Former [2000/16]TACTILE SIMULATOR
Former [2000/16]SIMULATEUR TACTILE
Entry into regional phase08.11.1999National basic fee paid 
08.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
19.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
22.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
06.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2002Fee for grant paid
13.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XA]US5200679  (GRAHAM DOUGLAS F [US]) [X] 1 [A] 2-9;
 [XA]US5052736  (LONCARIC JOSIP [US], et al) [X] 1 [A] 2-9;
 [XA]US4680523  (GOUMAS PETER G [US], et al) [X] 1 [A] 2-9;
 [A]GB2058009  (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK) [A] 1-9