Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993474

EP0993474 - GAS-PHASE POLYMERIZATION PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PROPYLENE / 1-PENTENE COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sasol Technology (Proprietary) Limited
1 Sturdee Avenue, Rosebank
Johannesburg / ZA
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Sasol Technology (Proprietary) Limited
1 Sturdee Avenue, Rosebank
Johannesburg / ZA
Inventor(s)01 / TINCUL, Ioan
27 Order Crescent
Sasolburg / ZA
02 / POTGIETER, Ignatius, Hendrik
15 Ramsbottom Street
Vanderbijlpark SE2 / ZA
03 / JOUBERT, Dawid Johannes
60 Leeukop Street, Vaalpark
Sasolburg / ZA
04 / POTGIETER, Antonie Hermanus
5 Third Avenue, Melville
Johannesburg / ZA
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Ablewhite, Alan James
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Ablewhite, Alan James
MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date98932367.003.07.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998GB01969
Priority number, dateZA1997000599704.07.1997         Original published format: ZA 9705997
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901485
Date:14.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993474
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993474
Date:10.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/37]
Search report(s)International search reportEP14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08F210/06, C08F2/34, C08F4/642, C08F4/654, C08F4/655, C08F4/649
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:POLYMERISATIONSVERFAHREN IN DER GASPHASE FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON PROPYLEN / 1-PENTEN COPOLYMEREN[2000/16]
English:GAS-PHASE POLYMERIZATION PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PROPYLENE / 1-PENTENE COPOLYMERS[2000/16]
French:PROCEDE DE POLYMERISATION EN PHASE GAZEUSE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DES COPOLYMERES DE PROPYLENE/1-PENTENE[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2000National basic fee paid 
10.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
21.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2003Fee for grant paid
21.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH10.09.2003
ES10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
IT10.09.2003
LI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
DK10.12.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2007/17]CH10.09.2003
ES10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
LI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
DK10.12.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
Former [2004/41]CH10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
LI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
DK10.12.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
Former [2004/22]CH10.09.2003
FI10.09.2003
LI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
Former [2004/16]FI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
GR10.12.2003
SE10.12.2003
Former [2004/14]FI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
GR10.12.2003
Former [2004/13]FI10.09.2003
NL10.09.2003
Former [2004/12]FI10.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]US5618895  (KERTH JUERGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,15,28 * abstract * * column 2, line 5 - column 4, line 14 * * example 3 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9624623  (SASTECH PTY LTD [ZA], et al) [A] 1-3,5,15,16,29,37-39,43,47,49,58 * abstract * * page 2, line 3 - page 4, line 3 * * page 4, line 24 - page 6, line 8 * * example 1 * * claims 1,7-11,14 *