EP0995279 - REBROADCASTING COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC GENERICS LIMITED Harston Mill Harston Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC GENERICS LIMITED Harston Mill Harston, Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB | ||
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC GENERICS LIMITED Harston Mill Harston, Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARCLAY, Michael, John Scientific Generics Limited Harston Mill Harston Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB | 02 /
VASILOPOULOS, Nicolas Scientific Generics Limited Harston Mill Harston Cambridgeshire CB2 5NH / GB | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98932390.2 | 07.07.1998 | [2000/17] | WO1998GB01996 | Priority number, date | GB19970014295 | 07.07.1997 Original published format: GB 9714295 | [2000/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9903216 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0995279 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0995279 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/24, H04H1/00, H04N7/20, H04N7/15, H04N7/173 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
H04H20/08 (EP);
H04B7/24 (EP);
H04N7/15 (EP);
H04N7/17345 (EP);
H04N7/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/17] | Title | German: | WIEDERHOLUNG-RUNDFUNKÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | [2000/17] | English: | REBROADCASTING COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2000/17] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION DE REEMISSION | [2000/17] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.12.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 07.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 25.09.2002 | GR | 25.09.2002 | NL | 25.09.2002 | DK | 25.12.2002 | PT | 26.12.2002 | ES | 28.03.2003 | [2007/17] |
Former [2004/04] | BE | 25.09.2002 | |
GR | 25.09.2002 | ||
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | BE | 25.09.2002 | |
GR | 25.09.2002 | ||
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | GR | 25.09.2002 | |
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | GR | 25.09.2002 | |
PT | 26.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 25.09.2002 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4041389 (OADES JOHN WILLSON) [Y] 16-18,20,21,24,26 * abstract * * figure 2 *; | [XY]US4367485 (HEMMIE DALE L) [X] 1-5,7-15,19,22,25 * claims 1,2,5 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 16-18,20,21,24,26; | [A]GB2291564 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,19-22 * abstract ** figure 1 *; | [XY]US5612948 (FETTE BRUCE A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,12,19,22 * abstract * * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 56 * * figures 1,5 * [Y] 16-18,20,21,24,26 |