EP0993747 - SUBSCRIBER SYSTEM WITH USER STATION WITH REMOVABLE DATA STORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORANGE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES LIMITED St. James Court, Great Park Road Almondsbury Bristol BS12 4QJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states ORANGE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES LIMITED St. James Court, Great Park Road Almondsbury, Bristol BS12 4QJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREEN, Mark 20 Manor Farm Crescent, Hutton, Weston-Super-Mare North Somerset BS24 9XB / GB | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Spaargaren, Jerome, et al Electronic Intellectual Property Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Spaargaren, Jerome, et al Electronic Intellectual Property, Suite 308, The Foundry, 156 Blackfriars Road London SE1 8EN / GB | ||
Former [2000/16] | Spaargaren, Jerome, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98932401.7 | 09.07.1998 | [2000/16] | WO1998GB02011 | Priority number, date | GB19970015243 | 18.07.1997 Original published format: GB 9715243 | [2000/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9904587 | Date: | 28.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0993747 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0993747 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
H04W8/22 (EP);
H04W12/126 (EP);
H04W12/35 (EP);
H04W12/06 (EP);
H04W12/45 (EP);
H04W12/71 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/16] | Title | German: | TEILNEHMER-SYSTEM MIT VERBRAUCHERSTATION MIT ENTNEHMBAREM DATENSPEICHER | [2004/34] | English: | SUBSCRIBER SYSTEM WITH USER STATION WITH REMOVABLE DATA STORE | [2000/16] | French: | SYSTEME D'ABONNES A STATION UTILISATEUR DOTEE D'UNE MEMOIRE DE DONNEES AMOVIBLE | [2000/16] |
Former [2000/16] | TEILNEHMER-SYSTEM MIT VERBRAUCHERSTATIONEN MIT ENTNEHMBAREN DATENSPEICHERN | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 15.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04002494.5 / EP1441552 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.03.2005 | CH | 16.03.2005 | LI | 16.03.2005 | NL | 16.03.2005 | DK | 16.06.2005 | GR | 16.06.2005 | CY | 09.07.2005 | LU | 09.07.2005 | IE | 11.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/21] | BE | 16.03.2005 | |
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
CY | 09.07.2005 | ||
IE | 11.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/17] | BE | 16.03.2005 | |
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
IE | 11.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | BE | 16.03.2005 | |
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
IE | 11.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 16.03.2005 | |
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
IE | 11.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | BE | 16.03.2005 | |
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | BE | 16.03.2005 | |
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | BE | 16.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9528062 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI]) [Y] 1-3,8,9,12,15,20,22 * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 14 * * page 11, line 28 - line 34 *; | [A]EP0685972 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1,13 * column 6, line 21 - column 8, line 58 *; | [XY]WO9635304 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [X] 20,21,23 * page 14, line 25 - page 15, line 28 * * page 18, line 15 - page 19, line 8 * * page 20, line 8 - line 29 * [Y] 2,3,22; | [XY]WO9636194 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [X] 18,19,21,23 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 25 * * page 12, line 21 - page 17, line 28 * [Y] 1,8,9,12,15,20; | [A]EP0781065 (ALCATEL MOBILE COMM FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 4 - line 13 * * column 10, line 1 - line 49 ** column 13, line 10 - column 14, line 40 * |