Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993640

EP0993640 - COMMAND PARSING AND REWRITE SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/16]COMMAND PARSING AND REWRITE SYSTEM
[2001/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lernout & Hauspie Speech Products N.V.
Sint-Krispijnstraat 7
8900 Leper / BE
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SHIEBER, Stuart, M.
243 Concord Avenue 2
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
02 / ARMSTRONG, John
36 Orchard Street
Cambridge, MA 02140 / US
03 / BAPTISTA, Rafael, Jose
35 Falmouth Road
Arlington, MA 02174 / US
04 / BENTZ, Bryan, A.
80 Wilcox Road
Stonington, CT 06378 / US
05 / GANONG, William, F., III
128 Davis Avenue
Brookline, MA 02146 / US
06 / SELESKY, Donald, Bryant
15 Bradley Lane
Westford, MA 01886 / US
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Exell, Jonathan Mark , et al
Elkington & Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/05]Exell, Jonathan Mark , et al
Elkington & Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2001/12]Ertl, Nicholas Justin , et al
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2000/16]Froud, Clive , et al
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date98932454.626.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998IB01133
Priority number, dateUS1997088563130.06.1997         Original published format: US 885631
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901829
Date:14.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993640
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993640
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/27, G10L17/00
[2002/36]
Former International [2000/16]G06F17/27, G10L5/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTAXANALYSE UND TRANSFORMATION VON BEFEHLEN[2001/36]
English:COMMAND PARSING AND REWRITE SYSTEM AND METHOD[2001/36]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE REECRITURE ET D'ANALYSE SYNTAXIQUE DE COMMANDES[2001/36]
Former [2000/16]VORRICHTUNG ZUR SYNTAXANALYSE UND TRANSFORMATION VON BEFEHLEN
Former [2000/16]COMMAND PARSING AND REWRITE SYSTEM
Former [2000/16]SYSTEME DE REECRITURE ET D'ANALYSE SYNTAXIQUE DE COMMANDES
Entry into regional phase27.10.1999National basic fee paid 
27.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
09.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.04.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
25.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2002Fee for grant paid
25.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Request for further processing for:25.05.2001Request for further processing filed
25.05.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.06.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
IT04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
DK04.12.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2007/17]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
DK04.12.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2005/21]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
FI04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/04]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/48]AT04.09.2002
BE04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT04.09.2002
CH04.09.2002
GR04.09.2002
LI04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2003/22]GR04.09.2002
NL04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
PT13.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR04.09.2002
SE04.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE04.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5640576  (KOBAYASHI KANAME [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3,10,15,20-22 * abstract * * figure 3 * * figure 19 *;
 [Y]EP0394628  (IBM [US]) [Y] 4-6 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5349526  (POTTS SR GEORGE W [US], et al) [A] 1,14,29
 [XY]  - WELLEKENS C J ET AL, "Acoustical decoding and linguistic analysis in speech recognition", REVUE HF, 1985, BELGIUM, ISSN 0035-3248, vol. 13, no. 5, pages 149 - 161, XP002083013 [X] 1,7-9,13,14,23,26,27,29 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0005] * * figure 7 * * idem * [Y] 2-6,10,15,20-22
 [A]  - ROE D B, "A SPOKEN LANGUAGE TRANSLATOR FOR RESTRICTED-DOMAIN CONTEXT-FREE LANGUAGES", SPEECH COMMUNICATION, (19920601), vol. 11, no. 2/03, pages 311 - 319, XP000279193 [A] 1,14,29 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0006] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-6393(92)90025-3
 [A]  - ZUE V ET AL, "THE VOYAGER SPEECH UNDERSTANDING SYSTEM: PRELIMINARY DEVELOPMENT AND EVALUATION1", SPEECH PROCESSING 1, ALBUQUERQUE, APRIL 3 - 6, 1990, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19900403), vol. 1, no. CONF. 15, pages 73 - 76, XP000146411 [A] 1,14,29 * page 75, column 1, line 7 - line 15 *