Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0998192

EP0998192 - AUTOMATIC EQUIPMENT TO WASH, DISINFECT, DRY AND STIMULATE THE DAIRY COW-TEATS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C.T.A. S.r.l.
via Ugolani Dati 16
26040 Pugnolo di Cella Dati (CR) / IT
[2000/19]
Inventor(s)01 / FARINA, Felice
Via Ugolani Dati, 16
I-26040 Pugnolo di Cella Dati / IT
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Mascioli, Alessandro
Via Leonina, 26
00184 Roma / IT
[2000/19]
Application number, filing date98932508.913.07.1998
[2000/19]
WO1998IT00194
Priority number, dateIT1997CR0000823.07.1997         Original published format: IT CR970008
[2000/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9904623
Date:04.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0998192
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999
[2000/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0998192
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:A01J7/04, A01K13/00
[2000/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/19]
Extension statesSI07.02.2000
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHE ANLAGEN ZUM WASCHEN, DESINFEKTIEREN, TROCKNEN UND STIMULIEREN VON MILCHKÜHEZITZEN[2000/19]
English:AUTOMATIC EQUIPMENT TO WASH, DISINFECT, DRY AND STIMULATE THE DAIRY COW-TEATS[2000/19]
French:EQUIPEMENT AUTOMATIQUE POUR LAVER, DESINFECTER, SECHER, ET STIMULER LES MAMELLES DE VACHES LAITIERES[2000/19]
Entry into regional phase07.02.2000National basic fee paid 
07.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
25.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2002Fee for grant paid
25.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
15.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200003   M06   Fee paid on   10.01.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
LU13.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/39]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
LU13.07.2003
Former [2004/02]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
Former [2003/43]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
Former [2003/39]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
Former [2003/37]AT11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
Former [2003/31]GR11.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0514765  (GILNA CORP NV [NL]) [DA] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [DA]EP0399132  (BODINI FRANCESCO [IT], et al) [DA] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [DA]FR2559351  (MARQUAIRE PIERRE [FR]) [DA] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]JPH0870726  ;
 [A]US4305346  (SPARR SR ANDERS V) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 096, no. 007, [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantFR2559351
 EP0399132
 EP0514765