Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018336

EP1018336 - Use of 4-cyclopentene-1,3-dione for the manufacture of a composition for treating cancer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/28]CARCINOSTATICS
[2004/34]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TAKARA BIO INC.
4-1, Seta 3-chome Otsu-shi
Shiga / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/14]For all designated states
TAKARA BIO INC.
4-1, Seta 3-chome
Otsu-shi, Shiga / JP
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
Takara Shuzo Co, Ltd.
609, Takenaka-cho, Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8061 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KOBAYASHI, Eiji, Central Research Laboratories
Takara Shuzo Co., Ltd., 4-1, Seta 3-chome
Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-2193 / JP
02 / KOYAMA, Nobuto, Central Research Laboratories
Takara Shuzo Co., Ltd., 4-1, Seta 3-chome
Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-2193 / JP
03 / KATO, Ikunoshin, Central Research Laboratories
Takara Shuzo Co., Ltd., 4-1, Seta 3-chome
Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-2193 / JP
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Gaunt, Robert John , et al
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins
1 St Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Gaunt, Robert John , et al
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn
London EC1N 2JD / GB
Application number, filing date98932571.716.07.1998
[2000/28]
WO1998JP03223
Priority number, dateJP1997021383925.07.1997         Original published format: JP 21383997
[2000/28]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9904777
Date:04.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1018336
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999
[2000/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.02.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/12, A61K31/122, A61P35/00
[2003/25]
Former International [2000/28]A61K31/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/28]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von 4-Cyclopenten-1,3-dion zur Herstellung einer Zusammensetzung für die Behandlung von Krebs[2004/34]
English:Use of 4-cyclopentene-1,3-dione for the manufacture of a composition for treating cancer[2004/34]
French:Utilisation de 4-cyclopentène-1,3-dione pour la fabrication d'une composition pharmaceutique destinée au traitement du cancer[2004/34]
Former [2000/28]KARZINOSTATIKA
Former [2000/28]CARCINOSTATICS
Former [2000/28]CARCINOSTATIQUES
Entry into regional phase10.12.1999Translation filed 
10.12.1999National basic fee paid 
10.12.1999Search fee paid 
10.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
10.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/28]
13.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/23]
12.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
06.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH06321831  ;
 [X]  - PERRY N B ET AL, "4 HYDROXY-2-CYCLOPENTENONE AN ANTI-PSEUDOMONAS AND CYTOTOXIC COMPONENT FROM PASSIFLORA-TETRANDA", PLANTA MEDICA, (1991), vol. 57, no. 2, ISSN 0032-0943, pages 129 - 131, XP008016403 [X] 1,2 * page 129, column L, line 31 - line 35 * * page 129, column R, line 41 - line 44 * * page 130, column L, line 1 - line 10 * * page 130, column L, line 16 - line 49 * * page 130, column R, line 1 - line 31 *
 [X]  - OHNO K ET AL, "SPECIFIC ROLE OF AN ALPHA BETA-UNSATURATED CARBONYL GROUP IN GAMMA GLUTAMYLCYSTEINE SYNTHETASE INDUCTION BY PROSTAGLANDIN A-2", CHEMICO-BIOLOGICAL INTERACTIONS, (1990), vol. 76, no. 1, ISSN 0009-2797, pages 77 - 88, XP008016397 [X] 1,2 * page 77, line 5 - line 9 * * page 78, line 40 - line 41 * * page 82 - page 85 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0009-2797(90)90035-L
 [X]  - LIZARDI L ET AL, "SULFHYDRYL ALKYLATING AGENTS INDUCE CALCIUM CURRENT IN SKELETAL MUSCLE FIBERS OF A CRUSTACEAN ATYA-LANIPES", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE BIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 129, no. 2, ISSN 0022-2631, pages 167 - 178, XP008016400 [X] 1,2 * page 174, column L, line 20 - line 35; figure 8 * * page 174, column R, line 1 - line 11; figure 7 * * page 176, column L, line 42 - line 57 * * page 176, column R, line 1 - line 38 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00219512
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 1995, no. 02, [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [XP]  - BUI TIM ET AL, "Effects of cyclopentenone prostaglandins and related compounds on insulin-like growth factor-I and Waf1 gene expression.", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (19980401), vol. 1397, no. 1, ISSN 0006-3002, pages 31 - 42, XP008016399 [XP] 1,2 * abstract * * page 32, column L, line 1 - line 6 * * figure B * * page 33, column L, line 7 - line 33 * * table 2 * * page 38, column L, line 36 - line 48 * * page 38, column R, line 1 - line 13 * * page 39, column L, line 1 - line 6 * * page 40, column L, line 28 - line 40 *
 [A]  - SINKOVICS J ET AL, "APOPTOSIS BY GENETIC ENGINEERING", LEUKEMIA, MACMILLAN PRESS LTD, US, (199404), vol. 8, ISSN 0887-6924, pages S98 - S102, XP000944783 [A] 1,2 * page S98, column L, line 13 - line 16 * * page S99, line 19 - line 21 *
International search[A]JPH06321831  (TEIJIN LTD)
 [A]  - INAYAMA S., ET AL., "STRUCTURE AND ANTITUMOR ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIP OF 2-ARYLIDENE-4- CYCLOPENTENE-1,3-DIONES AND 2-ARYLIDENEINDAN-1,3-DIONES.", Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19760101), vol. 19., no. 03., doi:10.1021/jm00225a022, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 433 - 436., XP002912290

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00225a022