Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994794

EP0994794 - HEADREST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.08.2002
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.09.2002  [2002/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Meye, August Leon
Schoenerstraat 71
1503 BB Zaandam / NL
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Van Breda, Jacobus , et al
Octrooibureau Los & Stigter
P.O. Box 20052
1000 HB Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Van Breda, Jacobus , et al
Octrooibureau Los & Stigter, P.O. Box 20052
1000 HB Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date98932632.708.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998NL00394
Priority number, dateNL1997100651609.07.1997         Original published format: NL 1006516
[2000/17]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9902376
Date:21.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994794
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60R22/00, B60N2/48
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   IT,   LU,   NL,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:KOPFSTÜTZE[2000/17]
English:HEADREST[2000/17]
French:APPUI-TETE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase08.07.1998Translation filed 
07.01.2000National basic fee paid 
07.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
01.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/38]
12.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]FR2316102  (SATZINGER ROLAND [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 4; figure - * [Y] 3-5;
 [DAY]FR2721880  (BROSSARD GILBERT [FR]) [DA] 1,2,5 * page 2, line 1 - line 20; figure - * [Y] 3,4;
 [AY]JPH06156185
 [AY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940907), vol. 018, no. 479, Database accession no. (M - 1669), [A] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 5
by applicantDE9001789U
 FR2721880
 DE4306555