Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993450

EP0993450 - 1,4-DIHYDROPYRIMIDINES AS N-TYPE CALCIUM CHANNELS ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/16]NEW COMPOUNDS
[2001/32]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  19.04.2002
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 05.06.2002  [2002/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AstraZeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[2000/19]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Astra Aktiebolag (publ)
151 85 Södertälje / SE
Inventor(s)01 / DOWNS, Eileen S.
Astra Arcus USA, Inc., P.O. Box 20890
Rochester, NY 14603 / US
02 / MICHNE, William F.
Astra Arcus USA, Inc., P.O. Box 20890
Rochester, NY 14603 / US
03 / PIERSON, M. Edward Jr.
Astra Arcus USA, Inc., P.O Box 20890
Rochester, NY 14603 / US
[2000/16]
Representative(s)As Sivborg, Susanne Birgitta
Astra AB, Intellectual Property, Patents
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]As Sivborg, Susanne Birgitta
Astra AB, Intellectual Property, Patents
151 85 Södertälje / SE
Application number, filing date98932675.622.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998SE01208
Priority number, dateSE1997000256402.07.1997         Original published format: SE 9702564
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901438
Date:14.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993450
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07D239/20, A61K31/505
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
Extension statesLT02.02.2000
LV02.02.2000
MK02.02.2000
RO02.02.2000
SI02.02.2000
TitleGerman:1,4 - DIHYDROPYRIMIDINE ALS N-TYP CALZIUMKANAL ANTAGONISTEN[2001/32]
English:1,4-DIHYDROPYRIMIDINES AS N-TYPE CALCIUM CHANNELS ANTAGONISTS[2001/32]
French:1,4-DIHYDROPYRIMIDES COMME INHIBITHEURS DES CANAUX DE CALCIUM DE TYPE N[2001/32]
Former [2000/16]NEUE VERBINDUNGEN
Former [2000/16]NEW COMPOUNDS
Former [2000/16]NOUVEAUX COMPOSES
Entry into regional phase02.02.2000National basic fee paid 
02.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
02.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
21.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
04.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/23]
14.01.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US4822798  (STOLTEFUSS JURGEN [DE], et al);
 [A]EP0697407  (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP])
 [A]  - J. MED. CHEM., Volume 32, 1989, HIDETSURA CHO et al., "Dihydropyrimidines: Novel Calcium Antagonists with Potent and Long-Lasting Vasodilative and Antihypertensive Activity", pages 2399-2406.,