Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991433

EP0991433 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR STERILIZING MEDICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.09.2004
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STERIS CORPORATION
5960 Heisley Road Mentor
Ohio 44060 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
STERIS CORPORATION
5960 Heisley Road
Mentor, Ohio 44060 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MALCHESKY, Paul, S.
239 Barrington Ridge
Painesville Twp., OH 44077 / US
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Gasquet, Denis
CABINET GASQUET
Les Pléiades 24C
Park-Nord Annecy
74370 Metz Tessy / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Gasquet, Denis
CABINET GASQUET, Les Pléiades, Park-Nord Annecy
74370 Metz Tessy / FR
Application number, filing date98932811.723.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998US13001
Priority number, dateUS1997088246625.06.1997         Original published format: US 882466
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9858682
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0991433
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991433
Date:19.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61L2/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STERILISATION VON MEDIZINISCHEN GERÄTEN[2000/15]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR STERILIZING MEDICAL DEVICES[2000/15]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE STERILISATION DE DISPOSITIFS MEDICAUX[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase21.12.1999National basic fee paid 
21.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.12.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
21.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
15.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
15.10.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
05.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
10.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2003Fee for grant paid
07.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.11.2003
GR19.02.2004
PT19.04.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2004/33]AT19.11.2003
GR19.02.2004
Former [2004/31]AT19.11.2003
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5439654  (KOCHTE WERNER W [US]) [Y] 1-10 * see claims;; figures 3-6 *;
 [Y]EP0709056  (FUJINON MEDICAL HOLLAND B V [NL]) [Y] 1-10 * see claims; column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 10 * * figure 3 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 5 *;
 [A]US5279799  (MOSER HANSRUEDI [CH]) [A] 1-4,6-9 * see claims;; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5494637  (BARLOW DAVID E [US]) [A] 1-4,6-9 * see claims;; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]EP0232170  (INNOVATIVE MEDICAL TECHNOLOG [US]) [A] 1-5,8 * see claims;; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5217698  (SIEGEL NORMAN L [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,8,10 * see claims;; figure 5 *;
 [A]US5225160  (SANFORD BILL R [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6,8 * see claims;; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5494530  (GRAF MARCEL [CH]) [A] 1-4,6,8 * see claims;; figure 2 *