Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992106

EP0992106 - A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR OFFSETTING PLASMA BIAS VOLTAGE IN BIPOLAR ELECTROSTATIC CHUCKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.06.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.07.2006  [2006/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LAM RESEARCH CORPORATION
4650 Cushing Parkway
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LAMBSON, Albert, M.
623 Fortuna Common
Fremont, CA 94539 / US
02 / CAPLE, Rick
6248 Rubicon Avenue
Newark, CA 94560 / US
03 / LENZ, Eric, H.
5960 Foligno Way
San Jose, CA 95138 / US
04 / BRAUN, Laura, M.
145 Mojave Common
Fremont, CA 94539 / US
05 / MARSH, Ricky
2778 Dos Rios
San Ramon, CA 94583 / US
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Browne, Robin Forsythe
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Tower North Central
Merrion Way
Leeds
LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr.
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB
Application number, filing date98932840.624.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998US13159
Priority number, dateUS1997088306827.06.1997         Original published format: US 883068
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900889
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992106
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992106
Date:10.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02N13/00, H01L21/68
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   IE,   IT,   NL [2000/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER PLASMAVORSPANNUNGSQUELLE BEI EINER BIPOLAREN ELEKTROSTATISCHEN HALTEPLATTE[2005/06]
English:A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR OFFSETTING PLASMA BIAS VOLTAGE IN BIPOLAR ELECTROSTATIC CHUCKS[2000/15]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT LE DECALAGE DE LA TENSION DE POLARISATION DU PLASMA DANS DES SUPPORTS ELECTROSTATIQUES BIPOLAIRES[2000/15]
Former [2000/15]VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR VERSETZUNG DER PLASMAVORSPANNUNGSQUELLE IN BIPOLAR ELEKTROSTATISCHEN HALTEPLATTE
Entry into regional phase14.01.2000National basic fee paid 
14.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
23.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2005Fee for grant paid
07.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
06.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.08.2005
[2006/13]
Cited inInternational search[A]US5557215  (SAEKI HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] * column 14, line 65 - column 15, line 5; figure 7 *;
 [A]GB2293689  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] * column 10, line 13 - column 11, line 10; figure 6B *;
 [A]EP0615281  (EATON CORP [US]);
 [A]US5103367  (HORWITZ CHRISTOPHER M [AU], et al)