blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0993508


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.08.2008 Change - representative published on  03.09.2008  [2008/36]
19.04.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  05.06.2002  [2002/23]
27.12.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn
17.08.2001 Examination report or reply
13.06.2001 Renewal fee
27.04.2001 First examination report
25.04.2001 Examination report or reply
03.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
03.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
28.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
24.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
14.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
12.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
12.01.2000 Renewal fee
11.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
03.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication