blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0993508
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002507232Global Dossier 05.03.2002A
Priority number Date
US9813189 25.06.1998
US5116197 27.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0993508Global Dossier 19.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9813189 25.06.1998
US5116197 27.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9810490 27.11.2001A
Priority number Date
US9813189 25.06.1998
US5116197 27.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2295118 07.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9813189 25.06.1998
US5116197 27.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9900480Global Dossier 07.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
US5116197 27.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR016293 04.07.2001A1
Priority number Date
US5116197 27.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1268971 04.10.2000A
Priority number Date
US5116197 27.06.1997