Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993508

EP0993508 - NON-AQUEOUS DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING BLEACH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.04.2002
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LABEQUE, Regine
Lombardzijde 27
B-1120 Neder-over-Heembeek / BE
02 / MEYER, Axel
Rue des confederes 28
B-1000 Brussels / BE
03 / COOSEMANS, Steven, Jozef, Louis
Terloonststraat 25
B-1910 Kampenhout / BE
04 / JOHNSTON, James, Pyott
Weidelaan 17
B-3090 Overijse / BE
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle , et al
N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A.
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle , et al
N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Former [2000/16]Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle , et al
BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe Sprl, Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date98932855.425.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998US13189
Priority number, dateUS19970051161P27.06.1997         Original published format: US 51161 P
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900480
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993508
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/00, C11D3/39
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:NICHTWÄSSERIGE, BLEICHMITTEL ENTHALTENDE WASCHMITTEL[2000/16]
English:NON-AQUEOUS DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING BLEACH[2000/16]
French:COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES NON AQUEUSES CONTENANT UN AGENT DE BLANCHIMENT[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase27.12.1999National basic fee paid 
27.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
30.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/23]
03.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9700937  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-5;
 [A]WO9610073  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-5