Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260052

EP1260052 - CRYPTOGRAPHIC COMMUNICATION PROCESS AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.08.2006
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tecsec, Incorporated
1953 Gallows Road, Suite 220
Vienna, VA 22182 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Tecsec, Incorporated
1953 Gallows Road, Suite 220
Vienna, VA 22182 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SCHEIDT, Edward, M.
1048 Dead Run Drive
McLean, VA 22101 / US
02 / WACK, C., Jay
13715 Lewisdale Road
Clarksburg, MD 20871 / US
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98933010.502.07.1998
[2002/48]
WO1998US13626
Priority number, dateUS1998010831201.07.1998         Original published format: US 108312
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0002340
Date:13.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1260052
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1260052
Date:19.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.09.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/00
[2004/16]
Former International [2002/48]H04L9/18, H04L9/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/48]
Extension statesAL31.01.2001
LT31.01.2001
LV31.01.2001
MK31.01.2001
RO31.01.2001
SI31.01.2001
TitleGerman:KRYPTOGRAPHISCHES VERMITTLUNGSVERFAHREN UND GERÄT[2002/48]
English:CRYPTOGRAPHIC COMMUNICATION PROCESS AND APPARATUS[2002/48]
French:PROCESSUS ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION CRYPTOGRAPHIQUE[2002/48]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2001National basic fee paid 
31.01.2001Search fee paid 
31.01.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
31.01.2001Examination requested  [2002/48]
29.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2005Fee for grant paid
18.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
29.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
CY19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
ES30.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
LU02.07.2006
IE03.07.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
ES30.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
LU02.07.2006
IE03.07.2006
Former [2007/29]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
ES30.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
IE03.07.2006
Former [2006/38]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
GR19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
ES30.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/36]AT19.10.2005
BE19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
ES30.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/34]AT19.10.2005
FI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
DK19.01.2006
SE19.01.2006
ES30.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/33]FI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
SE19.01.2006
ES30.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/27]FI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
SE19.01.2006
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/25]FI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
PT20.03.2006
Former [2006/24]FI19.10.2005
NL19.10.2005
Documents cited:Search[YA]US4316055  (FEISTEL HORST) [Y] 1,11,21,31,41,47 * abstract * * column 4, line 37 - column 6, line 45 * * figure 1 * [A] 2-10,12-20,22-30,32-40,42-46,48-52;
 [YA]  SHANNON C E, "COMMUNICATION THEORY OF SECRECY SYSTEMS", BELL SYSTEM TECHNICAL JOURNAL, AMERICAN TELEPHONE AND TELEGRAPH CO. NEW YORK, US, (19491001), vol. 28, pages 656 - 715, XP000199925 [Y] 1,11,21,31,41,47 * page 670, line 22 - page 673, line 18 * [A] 2-10,12-20,22-30,32-40,42-46,48-52
International search[XE]US5835597  (COPPERSMITH DON [US], et al);
 [XE]US5787173  (SCHEIDT EDWARD M [US], et al)