Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1011346

EP1011346 - ANIMAL FEED CONTAINING CARBOXYLIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.01.2004
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WISCONSIN ALUMNI RESEARCH FOUNDATION
614 North Walnut Street
Madison, WI 53705 / US
For all designated states
THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS
352 Henry Administration Building
506 South Wright Street
Urbana, IL 61801 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
WISCONSIN ALUMNI RESEARCH FOUNDATION
614 North Walnut Street
Madison, WI 53705 / US
For all designated states
THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS
352 Henry Administration Building, 506 South Wright Street
Urbana, Illinois 61801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DeLUCA, Hector, F.
1809 Highway BB
Deerfield, WI 53531 / US
02 / BAKER, David, H.
2609 Wadsworth Lane
Urbana, IL 61802 / US
[2000/51]
Former [2000/26]01 / DeLUCA, Hector, F.
1809 Highway BB
Deerfield, WI 53531 / US
02 / BAKER, David, H.
2313 Brookshire West
Champaign, IL 61821 / US
Representative(s)Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98933015.401.07.1998
[2000/26]
WO1998US13634
Priority number, dateUS1997092460705.09.1997         Original published format: US 924607
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9912431
Date:18.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1011346
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999
[2000/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1011346
Date:26.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:A23K1/16, A23K1/165, A23K1/175, A61K31/19
[2000/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/26]
TitleGerman:CARBONSAÜRE ENTHALTENDES TIERFUTTER[2000/26]
English:ANIMAL FEED CONTAINING CARBOXYLIC ACIDS[2000/26]
French:ALIMENT POUR ANIMAUX CONTENANT DES ACIDES CARBOXYLIQUES[2000/26]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2000National basic fee paid 
27.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.03.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
18.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2002Fee for grant paid
13.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.03.2003
BE26.03.2003
FI26.03.2003
GR26.03.2003
DK26.06.2003
PT26.06.2003
SE26.06.2003
CY01.07.2003
LU01.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/39]AT26.03.2003
BE26.03.2003
FI26.03.2003
GR26.03.2003
DK26.06.2003
PT26.06.2003
SE26.06.2003
CY01.07.2003
LU01.07.2003
Former [2004/36]AT26.03.2003
BE26.03.2003
FI26.03.2003
GR26.03.2003
DK26.06.2003
PT26.06.2003
SE26.06.2003
CY01.07.2003
Former [2004/23]AT26.03.2003
BE26.03.2003
FI26.03.2003
GR26.03.2003
DK26.06.2003
PT26.06.2003
SE26.06.2003
Former [2004/10]AT26.03.2003
BE26.03.2003
FI26.03.2003
GR26.03.2003
PT26.06.2003
SE26.06.2003
Former [2004/01]AT26.03.2003
FI26.03.2003
GR26.03.2003
PT26.06.2003
SE26.06.2003
Former [2003/50]AT26.03.2003
FI26.03.2003
GR26.03.2003
SE26.06.2003
Former [2003/47]AT26.03.2003
FI26.03.2003
GR26.03.2003
Former [2003/46]FI26.03.2003
GR26.03.2003
Former [2003/41]FI26.03.2003
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0004691  (RUHR STICKSTOFF AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8,17-19,21-24,52-55,57,58,69 * the whole document * [Y] 10-16,26-34,60-68;
 [X]WO9220240  (GREEN SCOTT T [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * example 3; claim 1 *;
 [Y]WO9624258  (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US]) [Y] 10-16,26-34,43-51,60-68 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2083997  (BP NUTRITION) [A] 1 * claims 1-5 *;
 [A]US5516525  (EDWARDS JR HARDY M [US]) [A] 10-16,26-34,43-51,60-68 * claims 1-5 *;
 [A]CA2079573
 [XY]  - HOHLER, D, "Influence of supplementing a maize-soybean meal diet with citric and fumaric acid on the uitlization of zinc and other minerals in piglets", CAB, CAB INTERNATIONAL, WALLINGFORD, OXON, GB, (1992), XP002082998 [X] 1-9,17-25,35-42 * abstract * [Y] 10-16,26-34,43-51
    [] - HOHLER D., Untersuchungen zum Einfluss einer Zulage an Citronen- und Fumarsaure zu einer Mais-Soya-Diat auf die Verwertung von Zink sowie weiterer Mineralstoffe beim Ferkel, GERMANY, JUSTUS-LIEBIG-UNIVERSITAT GIESSEN, (1992) [ ] * page 183 *
 [X]  - HOHLER D., PALLAUF J., "Effekt einer abgestuften Zn-Zufuhr und Zulagen von Citronensäure zu einer Mais-Soja-Diät auf Leistungsparameter und Mineralstoffverwertung beim Ferkel", JOURNAL OF ANIMAL PHYSIOLOGY AND ANIMAL NUTRITION, (1994), vol. 71, no. 4/5, page 189-199, XP002082997 [X] 1,2,4,9,35-37,39,42 * page 197, paragraph 3 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 23, Database accession no. 94-184087, XP002082999 & CA2079573 A 19940323 (ANDERSON E C) [A] 1-69 * abstract *