Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991697

EP0991697 - FUNCTIONALIZED POLY(ALKYLENE CARBONATE), AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.05.2002
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.07.2002  [2002/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PAC Polymers Inc.
100 Interchange Boulevard
Newark, DE 19711 / US
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SANT'ANGELO, Joseph, G.
7 Doe's Lane
Centreville, DE 19807 / US
02 / McGINNIS, Vincent, D.
1315 N. State Route 3
Sunburg, OH 43074 / US
03 / CHEN, Xiaomao
201 G. Chestnut Crossing Drive
Newark, DE 19713 / US
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L.
Patentanwälte
Postfach 3929
65029 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte, Postfach 3929
65029 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date98933163.229.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998US13927
Priority number, dateUS1997005126730.06.1997         Original published format: US 51267
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900444
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991697
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.01.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08G77/04, C08G64/02, G03F7/038
[2000/43]
Former International [2000/15]C08G77/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:FUNKTIONALISIERTE POLY-(ALKYLENECARBONATE) UND DEREN ANWENDUNG[2000/15]
English:FUNCTIONALIZED POLY(ALKYLENE CARBONATE), AND USE THEREOF[2000/15]
French:POLY(ALKYLENE CARBONATE) FONCTIONNALISE ET SON UTILISATION[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2000National basic fee paid 
26.01.2000Search fee paid 
26.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
26.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
03.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/28]
11.02.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0570908  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-9 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4301231  (ATARASHI YUJI, et al) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 11 * * claim 1 *
International search[X]US4066630  (DIXON DALE D, et al);
 [X]US4104264  (DIXON DALE D, et al);
 [X]US4145525  (DIXON DALE D, et al);
 [X]US4303759  (DIXON DALE D, et al)