Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994687

EP0994687 - DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLES WITH CLOTHLIKE FEEL BACKSHEET HAVING ZONED BREATHABILITY AND PROCESS FOR MAKING SUCH BACKSHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ISELE, Olaf, Erik, Alexander
Konigsteiner Strasse 10
D-61389 Schmitten-Oberreifenberg / DE
02 / BERUDA, Holger
Am Wolfes 7
D-65779 Kelkheim-Ruppertshain / DE
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Hirsch, Uwe Thomas , et al
Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date98933242.408.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998US14091
Priority number, dateEP1997011150108.07.1997         Original published format: EP 97111501
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9902114
Date:21.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994687
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994687
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/20]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:ABSORBIERENDER WEGWERFARTIKEL MIT KLEIDUNGSÄHNLICHEN, ÄUSSEREN SCHICHTEN, WELCHE UNTERSCHIEDLICHE ATMUNGSFÄHIGKEITEN BESITZEN UND DIE METHODE SOLCHE SCHICHTEN HERZUSTELLEN[2000/17]
English:DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLES WITH CLOTHLIKE FEEL BACKSHEET HAVING ZONED BREATHABILITY AND PROCESS FOR MAKING SUCH BACKSHEETS[2000/17]
French:ARTICLES ABSORBANTS JETABLES A ZONES DE RESPIRABILITE DIFFERENTES, POURVUS D'UNE FEUILLE DE SUPPORT AU TOUCHER SIMILAIRE A CELUI D'UN TISSU ET LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase07.02.2000National basic fee paid 
07.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
08.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2002Fee for grant paid
12.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
DK27.02.2003
PT27.02.2003
IE08.07.2003
LU08.07.2003
[2007/17]
Former [2004/40]AT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
IE08.07.2003
LU08.07.2003
Former [2004/39]AT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
LU08.07.2003
Former [2003/43]AT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
Former [2003/39]AT27.11.2002
CH27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
LI27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
Former [2003/37]AT27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
Former [2003/31]GR27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
Former [2003/29]PT27.02.2003
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4341216  (OBENOUR MARY C) [X] 1,2,5,14,15 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 10; figure - * * column 5, line 5 - line 8 * * column 8, line 61 - column 9, line 22 * * column 8, line 9 - line 13; example - * [A] 3,11;
 [XA]US4713069  (WANG KENNETH Y [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11 * column 8, line 37 - line 39; figure -; claims 1,9,13,14 * * column 8, line 49 - line 50 * * column 8, line 61 - line 63 * * column 9, line 3 - line 17 * * column 10, line 10 - line 15 * [A] 7,12-14;
 [XA]WO9700056  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2,11,12,14 * page 8, line 7 - line 19; figures 3,4 * * page 9, line 16 - line 26; claim 1 * [A] 16,17;
 [XA]US5571096  (DOBRIN GEORGE C [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * column 6, line 30 - line 44; figure -; claims 1,2,14 * * column 9, line 43 - column 10, line 58 * [A] 2;
 [X]WO9004375  (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 29; figure 1; claims 4,17 *;
 [X]GB2171915  (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 1 * page 2, line 64 - line 101; claims 1,9,10 *;
 [A]GB2290052  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 7-16 * page 9, line 6 - page 10, line 1; claims 1,4,12 * * page 10, line 32 - page 11, line 23 *;
 [A]GB2295322  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1,3-6,11,15 * page 8, line 4 - line 7; claims 1,6,7,11,24,25 * * page 7, line 14 - line 24 *;
 [A]GB2296216  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 3,4,13-15 * page 5, line 15 - line 16; example - * * page 8, line 13 - line 32; claims 7,10,12-15,17 *;
 [A]WO9112125  (CLOPAY CORP [US]) [A] 16,19 * page 22, line 2 - page 23, line 17; claims 1,4 *;
 [A]US4806300  (WALTON RICHARD R [US], et al) [A] 16,18,19 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 5; figure -; claim 1 * * column 3, line 38 - line 39 *