Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994928

EP0994928 - AZEOTROPE AND AZEOTROPE-LIKE COMPOSITIONS OF 1-BROMOPROPANE AND DICHLOROPENTAFLUOROPROPANES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  14.04.2000
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.04.2000Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 31.05.2000 [2000/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Highway 52 Northwest P.O. Box 2200 West Lafayette
Indiana 47906 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Highway 52 Northwest P.O. Box 2200
West Lafayette Indiana 47906 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DEGROOT, Richard, J.
2170 Hope Court
West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Atkinson, Peter Birch , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester M1 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Atkinson, Peter Birch , et al
MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester M2 3LG / GB
Application number, filing date98933296.009.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998US14251
Priority number, dateUS19970052006P09.07.1997         Original published format: US 52006 P
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9902615
Date:21.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994928
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C09D9/00, C11D7/50, C23G5/02
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/17]
TitleGerman:AZEOTROPE SOWIE AZEOTROPÄHNLICHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS 1-BROMPROPAN UND DICHLORPENTAFLUORPROPANEN[2000/17]
English:AZEOTROPE AND AZEOTROPE-LIKE COMPOSITIONS OF 1-BROMOPROPANE AND DICHLOROPENTAFLUOROPROPANES[2000/17]
French:COMPOSITIONS AZEOTROPES, ET DU TYPE AZEOTROPE, DE 1-BROMOPROPANE ET DE DICHLOROPENTAFLUOROPROPANES[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase01.02.2000National basic fee paid 
01.02.2000Search fee paid 
01.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
01.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
21.03.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2000/22]
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5531916  (MERCHANT ABID N [US]);
 [Y]US4652389  (MOLL KARL [US])