Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994929

EP0994929 - AZEOTROPE AND AZEOTROPE-LIKE COMPOSITIONS OF 1-BROMOPROPANE AND HIGHLY FLUORINATED HYDROCARBONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.09.2005  [2005/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Highway 52 Northwest P.O. Box 2200 West Lafayette
Indiana 47906 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Highway 52 Northwest P.O. Box 2200
West Lafayette Indiana 47906 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DeGROOT, Richard, J.
2170 Hope Court
West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Atkinson, Peter Birch , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester M1 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Atkinson, Peter Birch , et al
MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester M2 3LG / GB
Application number, filing date98933297.809.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998US14252
Priority number, dateUS19970052058P09.07.1997         Original published format: US 52058 P
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9902616
Date:21.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994929
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994929
Date:22.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.01.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:C09D9/00, C11D7/50, C23G5/02, C23G5/028
[2001/06]
Former International [2000/17]C09D9/00, C11D7/50, C23G5/02
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/17]
TitleGerman:AZEOTROPE SOWIE AZEOTROPÄHNLICHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS 1-BROMPROPAN UNDHOCHFLUORIERTEN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN[2000/17]
English:AZEOTROPE AND AZEOTROPE-LIKE COMPOSITIONS OF 1-BROMOPROPANE AND HIGHLY FLUORINATED HYDROCARBONS[2000/17]
French:COMPOSITIONS AZEOTROPES, ET DU TYPE AZEOTROPE, DE 1-BROMOPROPANE ET D'HYDROCARBURES A HAUTE TENEUR EN FLUOR[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase01.02.2000National basic fee paid 
01.02.2000Search fee paid 
01.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
01.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
16.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2004Fee for grant paid
22.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[AY]DE19614355  (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [A] 4,6,12,17 * claim 1 * * page 2, lines 43-46; claim 1 * [Y] 1-3,5,7-11,13-16,18-22;
 [AY]JPH03176433  ;
 [AY]JPH05124990  ;
 [AY]US5064559  (MERCHANT ABID N [US], et al) [A] 4,6,12,17 * claims 1,11 * [Y] 1-3,5,7-11,13-16,18-22;
 [AY]US5064560  (MERCHANT ABID N [US]) [A] 4,6,12,17 * claims 1,13 * [Y] 1-3,5,7-11,13-16,18-22;
 [E]WO9935210  (DU PONT [US], et al) [E] 1-22 * claim 1 *
 [AY]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 43, Database accession no. 1991-313393, XP002156059 & JPH03176433 A 19910731 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 4,6,12,17 * abstract * [Y] 1-3,5,7-11,13-16,18-22
 [AY]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 25, Database accession no. 1993-200458, XP002156060 & JPH05124990 A 19930521 (MITSUI FLUOROCHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 4,6,12,17 * abstract * [Y] 1-3,5,7-11,13-16,18-22
International search[Y]US5064559  (MERCHANT ABID N [US], et al);
 [Y]US5196137  (MERCHANT ABID N [US]);
 [Y]US4652389  (MOLL KARL [US])