blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0995074 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0995074



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 139
05.08.2005 Closing of application Search / examination 1
22.04.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 1
25.02.2005 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
11.01.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) Search / examination 1
08.01.2005 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
04.01.2005 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
09.09.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
09.09.2004 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
09.09.2004 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
09.09.2004 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
17.08.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.07.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
15.07.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.07.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
12.03.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
12.03.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.01.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
11.01.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
06.01.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
25.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
25.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
15.02.1999 Priority document Search / examination 34
21.01.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
21.01.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 30