blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0995074


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.08.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  21.09.2005  [2005/38]
20.04.2005 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
31.08.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.07.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.07.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
12.03.2004 First examination report
09.03.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.07.2002 Renewal fee
20.07.2001 Renewal fee
04.08.2000 Renewal fee
10.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
10.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
29.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
17.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
23.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication