Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995074

EP0995074 - POLYOXYALKYLENE GLYCOL GELATIN CAPSULE FILL FORMULATIONS COMPRISING CROSSLINKED CARBOXYLIC COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.08.2005
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.09.2005  [2005/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
R.P. SCHERER CORPORATION
2301 West Big Beaver Road, Suite 222 Troy
Michigan 48007-7060 / US
For all designated states
RHEOX, INC.
Wyckoffs Mill Road Hightstown
New Jersey 08520 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
R.P. SCHERER CORPORATION
2301 West Big Beaver Road, Suite 222
Troy, Michigan 48007-7060 / US
For all designated states
RHEOX, INC.
Wyckoffs Mill Road
Hightstown, New Jersey 08520 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BAYLESS, Ronnie, E.
4113 North Forbes Road
Plant City, FL 33565 / US
02 / LABA, Dennis
246 Kilburn Road
Langhorne, PA 19047 / US
03 / REYNOLDS, William
10 Reno Court
Newtown, PA 08005 / US
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Weyland, J.J. Pierre
Marks & Clerk
B.P. 1775
1017 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Weyland, J.J. Pierre
Marks & Clerk, 6 Rue Glesener, BP 1775
1017 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date98933334.915.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998US14439
Priority number, dateUS1997089500317.07.1997         Original published format: US 895003
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9904218
Date:28.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995074
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:F42B12/40, A61K7/00, C09B67/08, C09B67/20
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:FORMULIERUNG AUF BASIS VON POLYOXYALKYLENGLYKOLEN ZUM FÜLLEN VON GELATIN KAPSELN,WOBEI DIESE FORMULIERUNG VERNETZTE UNGESÄTTIGTE CARBONSÜRE ENTHÄLT[2000/17]
English:POLYOXYALKYLENE GLYCOL GELATIN CAPSULE FILL FORMULATIONS COMPRISING CROSSLINKED CARBOXYLIC COPOLYMERS[2000/17]
French:FORMULATIONS DE REMPLISSAGE DE CAPSULES DE GELATINE, A BASE DE POLYOXYALKYLENEGLYCOL[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase17.02.2000National basic fee paid 
17.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
12.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/38]
22.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]US5393054  (ROUFFER MARK [CA]) [A] 1,2,17-19 * column W *;
 [A]US5448951  (OLSON CHRISTY L [US]) [A] 1,2,10,13,17-19,25 * column 3, line 51 - line 59 *;
 [PA]EP0786641  (GOLDCAPS INC [US]) [PA] 1,2,17-19 * example - *;
 [DA]US2288327  (SCHERER ROBERT P) [DA] 15 * page 1, column 1, line 5 - line 18 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [DA]US3861943  (GRAINGER NORMAN) [DA] 1,2,17-19 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 10; example - *;
 [DA]US5416158  (SANTHANAM MAHALINGHAM [US], et al) [DA] 1,4,11,14,19 * column 3, line 7 - line 17 * * column 4, line 4 - line 34 *;
 [A]JPS50155554  ;
 [A]JPH07242536
 [A]  - "Vinylbutyral resin curable compositions", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 78, no. 12, Database accession no. 78-22339a[12], XP002081543 & JPS50155554 A 19751215 (TOA GOSEI CHEM IND. LTD.) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - "Gelatine capsule for treating rhinitis or cold", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 46, Database accession no. 95-355167[46], XP002081544 & JPH07242536 A 19950919 (TOYO CAPSULE KK) [A] 1,2,17-19 * abstract *