blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0995010

EP0995010 - CORE BARREL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
2601 Belt Line Road
Carrollton, TX 75006 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/36]For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
2601 Beltline Road
Carrollton, TX 75006 / US
Former [2003/34]For all designated states
DII INDUSTRIES, LLC
2001 Ross Avenue
Dallas, Texas 75201 / US
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Dresser Industries Inc.
2001 Ross Avenue
Dallas, Texas 75201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FANUEL, Philippe
Rue du Bourgmestre 18
B-1050 Bruxelles / BE
02 / SERRON, Paul
Rue des Faînes 210
B-1120 Bruxelles / BE
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Claeys, Pierre, et al
Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2009/30]Claeys, Pierre, et al
Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Intellectual Property House, Brussels Airport Business Park Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
Former [2000/17]Claeys, Pierre, et al
Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Patent Attorneys, Rue de Livourne 7
1060 Brussels / BE
Application number, filing date98933379.408.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998BE00104
Priority number, dateBE1997000059008.07.1997         Original published format: BE 9700590
[2000/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9902816
Date:21.01.1999
Language:FR
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995010
Date:26.04.2000
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995010
Date:17.03.2004
Language:FR
[2004/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.1999
ClassificationIPC:E21B25/00, E21B25/02, E21B10/48
[2000/17]
CPC:
E21B25/02 (EP,US); E21B10/48 (EP,US); E21B25/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/17]
TitleGerman:KERNBOHRWERKZEUG[2000/17]
English:CORE BARREL[2000/17]
French:CAROTTIER[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase28.01.2000National basic fee paid 
28.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
24.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2004Fee for grant paid
02.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]GB486700  (ELLIOTT CORE DRILLING COMPANY) [X] 1,4 * page 3, line 2 - line 19 *;
 [A]FR1278207  (CHRISTENSEN DIAMOND PROD CO, et al) [A] 4* page 1, column R, line 31 - line 36 *;
 [Y]FR2197109  (TIGRE TIERRA [US]) [Y] 10 * figures 1,5 *;
 [XY]WO9005237  (CORPRO SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, line 1 * [Y] 3,10;
 [Y]WO9521988  (CORPRO SYSTEMS LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 3 * page 6, paragraph 3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.