Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990126

EP0990126 - PRESSURE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 08.11.2017  [2017/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANADIAN SPACE AGENCY
6767 Route de l'Aéroport Saint-Hubert
Quebec J3Y 8Y9 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
CANADIAN SPACE AGENCY
6767 Route de l'Aéroport
Saint-Hubert, Quebec J3Y 8Y9 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / REIMER, Ernest, M.
P.O. Box 50901 R.R.3
St. John's, Newfoundland A1B 4M2 / CA
02 / DANISCH, Lee, A.
Measurand Inc. P.O. Box 21029
Fredericton, New Brunswick E3B 7A3 / CA
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Lucas, Brian Ronald , et al
Lucas & Co.
135 Westhall Road
Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Lucas, Brian Ronald , et al
Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road
Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB
Former [2000/14]Johansson, Lars E.
Lars Johansson Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 68
801 02 Gävle / SE
Application number, filing date98933411.515.07.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998CA00686
Priority number, dateUS1997089526816.07.1997         Original published format: US 895268
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9904234
Date:28.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990126
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990126
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01L1/24, G01L11/02, G01L11/06
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:DRUCKSENSOR[2000/14]
English:PRESSURE SENSOR[2000/14]
French:CAPTEUR DE PRESSION[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2000National basic fee paid 
26.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
24.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
09.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
25.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2002Fee for grant paid
23.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
09.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
[2017/45]
Former [2007/18]AT25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2005/21]AT25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/39]AT25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/29]GR25.09.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR25.09.2002
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5425273  (CHEVALIER PHILIPPE [BE]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-13,25-28 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 23; figures 3,4B * [Y] 14,15;
 [Y]US4735212  (COHEN DONALD M [US]) [Y] 14,15 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 48; figures 8,9,12,16 *;
 [X]JPS62294928  ;
 [A]US3737844  (YOKOYAMA T, et al) [A] 4 * claim 1 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880602), vol. 012, no. 188, Database accession no. (P - 711), [X] 1,2 * abstract *