Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980315

EP0980315 - INKER UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.06.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.07.2003  [2003/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft
Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4
97080 Würzburg / DE
[2000/08]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHNEIDER, Georg
Fritz-Haber-Strasse 13
D-97080 Würzburg / DE
02 / KUTZNER, Willi, Albert, Peter
Johannes-Kepler-Strasse 22
D-97074 Würzburg / DE
03 / REDER, Wolfgang, Otto
Thüngersheimer Strasse 35
D-97209 Veitshöchheim / DE
[2000/08]
Application number, filing date98933503.911.05.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998DE01309
Priority number, dateDE199711956009.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19719560
[2000/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9851500
Date:19.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980315
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980315
Date:07.08.2002
Language:DE
[2002/32]
Search report(s)International search reportEP19.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:B41F31/02, B41F31/00
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/08]
TitleGerman:FARBWERK[2000/08]
English:INKER UNIT[2000/08]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ENCRAGE[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase02.12.1999National basic fee paid 
02.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
11.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.02.2002Fee for grant paid
21.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)08.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]DE1214704  (RITZERFELD GERHARD) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE19535266  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS2751843