Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981480

EP0981480 - METHOD AND DEVICE IN PARTICULAR FOR PACKAGING FLAT OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Winkler + Dünnebier Aktiengesellschaft
Sohler Weg 65
56564 Neuwied / DE
[2000/09]
Inventor(s)01 / SALM, Thomas
Steppenbergallee 135
D-52074 Aachen / DE
02 / DRIESSEN, Hans-Josef
Kaiserstrasse 69
D-52249 Eschweiler / DE
[2000/09]
Representative(s)Schieferdecker, Lutz
Patentanwalt Herrnstrasse 37
63065 Offenbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/09]Schieferdecker, Lutz, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Herrnstrasse 37
63065 Offenbach / DE
Application number, filing date98933504.712.05.1998
[2000/09]
WO1998DE01310
Priority number, dateDE1997208542U14.05.1997         Original published format: DE 29708542 U
[2000/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9851570
Date:19.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0981480
Date:01.03.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998
[2000/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0981480
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:B65B25/14, B65B27/08
[2000/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/09]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG INSBESONDERE ZUM VERPACKEN VON FLACHEN GEGENSTÄNDEN[2000/09]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE IN PARTICULAR FOR PACKAGING FLAT OBJECTS[2000/09]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DESTINES EN PARTICULIER A L'EMBALLAGE D'OBJETS PLATS[2000/09]
Entry into regional phase29.10.1999National basic fee paid 
29.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
25.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2001Fee for grant paid
12.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200003   M06   Fee paid on   18.08.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT05.12.2001
ES27.06.2002
[2008/16]
Former [2004/04]ES27.06.2002
Cited inInternational search[XY]FR2089756  (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER) [X] 1-6,13,18 * page 7, line 14 - page 9, line 34; figures 1-3 * [Y] 7-10,14-16;
 [YP]DE29708542U  (MEC GMBH [DE]) [YP] 7-10,14-16 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0506606