Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991373

EP0991373 - BAG FOR AT LEAST PARTIALLY ENVELOPING A HEART [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Acorn Cardiovascular, Inc.
601 Campus Drive
St- Paul, MN 55112 / US
[2004/17]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Haindl, Hans, Dr.
Hauptstrasse 39
30974 Wennigsen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dr. Haindl, Hans
Hauptstr. 39
30974 Wennigsen / DE
 [2004/19]
Former [2000/15]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/34]Meissner, Bolte & Partner
Anwaltssozietät GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48
80538 Munich / DE
Former [2000/15]Leine, Sigurd, Dipl.-Ing.
Leine & Wagner Patentanwälte Burckhardtstrasse 1
30163 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date98933619.316.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998EP03619
Priority number, dateDE199712638921.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19726389
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858598
Date:30.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991373
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991373
Date:15.09.2004
Language:DE
[2004/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2004/37]
Former [2004/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Former [2004/18]BE,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  SE 
Former [2004/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Former [2000/15]DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT 
TitleGerman:BEUTEL ZUR WENIGSTENS TEILWEISEN UMFASSUNG EINES HERZENS[2000/15]
English:BAG FOR AT LEAST PARTIALLY ENVELOPING A HEART[2000/15]
French:SACHET DESTINE A ENVELOPPER AU MOINS PARTIELLEMENT UN COEUR[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase29.11.1999National basic fee paid 
29.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
13.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
03.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
30.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2004Fee for grant paid
25.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.04.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT
Opposition(s)16.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.02.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2004BE   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003
18.02.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2004SE   M01   Fee paid on   19.12.2003
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200104   M06   Fee paid on   21.08.2001
30.06.200407   M06   Fee paid on   06.07.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR15.09.2004
GB15.09.2004
IT15.09.2004
SE15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2006/32]FR15.09.2004
GB15.09.2004
SE15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
Former [2005/46]GB15.09.2004
SE15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
Former [2005/27]SE15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
Former [2005/10]SE15.12.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US3983863  (JANKE WALTER H, et al) [X] 1,2,17,19,22 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR2737106  (COUSIN BIOTECH [FR]) [X] 1,2,17,19,21,22 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4690134  (SNYDERS ROBERT V [US]) [X] 1,2,17 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 17; figure - *;
 [PXA]US5702343  (ALFERNESS CLIFTON A [US]) [PX] 1-12,17,19,22,24 * the whole document * [A] 31;
 [A]WO9616601  (GORE & ASS [US]) [A] 1,17,25,31-33 * page 10, line 20 - page 13, line 2; figure - *
ExaminationWO9814136