Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989934

EP0989934 - INTEGRATED GUIDING DEVICE FOR PRINTING FERRULE OR ROLLER AND FERRULE OR ROLLER EQUIPPED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.03.2003  [2003/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seites
Jolysable
17800 Pons / FR
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Francille, Jean
Lieu dit Laroque
F-33910 Saint Ciers D'Abzac / FR
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Thébault, Jean-Louis
SCHMIT CHRETIEN 111, cours du Médoc
33300 Bordeaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Thébault, Jean-Louis
Cabinet Thébault 111 cours du Médoc
33300 Bordeaux / FR
Application number, filing date98933678.923.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998FR01306
Priority number, dateFR1997000816324.06.1997         Original published format: FR 9708163
[2000/14]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858803
Date:30.12.1998
Language:FR
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0989934
Date:05.04.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0989934
Date:27.03.2002
Language:FR
[2002/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:B41F27/12, B41F13/08
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:INTEGRIERTE FÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE HÜLSE ODER EINEN DRUCKZYLINDER UND HÜLSE ODER DRUCKZYLINDER AUSGERÜSTET MIT DIESER VORRICHTUNG[2000/14]
English:INTEGRATED GUIDING DEVICE FOR PRINTING FERRULE OR ROLLER AND FERRULE OR ROLLER EQUIPPED THEREWITH[2000/14]
French:DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE INTEGRE POUR MANCHON OU CYLINDRE D'IMPRESSION ET MANCHON OU CYLINDRE EQUIPE DE CE DISPOSITIF[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2000National basic fee paid 
14.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
23.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2001Fee for grant paid
13.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL27.03.2002
SE27.06.2002
[2003/09]
Former [2002/37]SE27.06.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]US2229133  (SANDS LEO M) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0523346  (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0170956  (BARTSCHI MARKUS) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3512776  (POSTEL WOLFGANG) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *