Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991712

EP0991712 - METHOD FOR PREPARING A SILICA SUSPENSION IN A VULCANISABLE SILICON MATRIX TO FORM ELASTOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.08.2006
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RHODIA CHIMIE
25, quai Paul Doumer
92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / CANPONT, Dominique
99, rue de la République
F-69600 Oullins / FR
02 / PLANTIER, André
F-38370 Saint-Prim / / FR
03 / POUCHELON, Alain
2, rue Georges Courteline
F-69330 Meyzieu / FR
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Trolliet, Maurice
RHODIA SERVICES
Direction de la Propriété Industrielle
CRIT-Carrières
B.P. 62
69192 Saint-Fons Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Trolliet, Maurice
RHODIA SERVICES Direction de la Propriété Industrielle CRIT-Carrières - BP 62
69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date98933691.223.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998FR01319
Priority number, dateFR1997000817124.06.1997         Original published format: FR 9708171
[2000/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858997
Date:30.12.1998
Language:FR
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991712
Date:12.04.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991712
Date:05.10.2005
Language:FR
[2005/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:C08K9/06, C08L83/07
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KIESELÄURESUSPENSION IN EINER VULKANISIERBAREN SILIKON-MATRIX GEEIGNET ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ELASTOMEREN[2000/15]
English:METHOD FOR PREPARING A SILICA SUSPENSION IN A VULCANISABLE SILICON MATRIX TO FORM ELASTOMERS[2000/15]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UNE SUSPENSION DE SILICE DANS UNE MATRICE SILICONE VULCANISABLE POUR FORMER DES ELASTOMERES[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase16.12.1999National basic fee paid 
16.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
09.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.08.2005Fee for grant paid
05.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI05.10.2005
IE05.10.2005
NL05.10.2005
DK05.01.2006
GR05.01.2006
SE05.01.2006
ES16.01.2006
PT06.03.2006
LU23.06.2006
BE30.06.2006
CH30.06.2006
LI30.06.2006
[2008/36]
Former [2007/30]FI05.10.2005
IE05.10.2005
NL05.10.2005
DK05.01.2006
GR05.01.2006
SE05.01.2006
ES16.01.2006
PT06.03.2006
BE30.06.2006
CH30.06.2006
LI30.06.2006
Former [2007/29]FI05.10.2005
IE05.10.2005
NL05.10.2005
DK05.01.2006
GR05.01.2006
SE05.01.2006
ES16.01.2006
PT06.03.2006
BE30.06.2006
Former [2006/40]FI05.10.2005
IE05.10.2005
NL05.10.2005
DK05.01.2006
GR05.01.2006
SE05.01.2006
ES16.01.2006
PT06.03.2006
Former [2006/38]FI05.10.2005
NL05.10.2005
DK05.01.2006
GR05.01.2006
SE05.01.2006
ES16.01.2006
PT06.03.2006
Former [2006/35]FI05.10.2005
NL05.10.2005
DK05.01.2006
SE05.01.2006
ES16.01.2006
PT06.03.2006
Former [2006/33]FI05.10.2005
NL05.10.2005
SE05.01.2006
ES16.01.2006
PT06.03.2006
Former [2006/27]FI05.10.2005
NL05.10.2005
SE05.01.2006
PT06.03.2006
Former [2006/25]FI05.10.2005
NL05.10.2005
PT06.03.2006
Former [2006/24]FI05.10.2005
NL05.10.2005
Former [2006/22]NL05.10.2005
Cited inInternational search[DA]US4785047  (JENSEN JARY D [US]) [DA] 1 * claims 1,2 *;
 [DA]EP0462032  (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [DA] 1 * claims 1,4-6 *;
 [A]US4585830  (SWEET RANDALL P [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0669376  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [DA]FR2320324  (BAYER AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * claims 1,2,4 *
ExaminationEP0856561