Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993252

EP0993252 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR DIP MOULDING VARIOUS PIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.04.2004  [2004/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RICHARD, Jean-Pierre
137, chemin de la Marinade
69270 Rochetaillée-sur-Saône / FR
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Thibault, Jean-Marc
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
51, Avenue Jean Jaurès
B.P. 7073
69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Thibault, Jean-Marc
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, Avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 7073
69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date98933692.023.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998FR01320
Priority number, dateFR1997000817224.06.1997         Original published format: FR 9708172
[2000/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858547
Date:30.12.1998
Language:FR
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993252
Date:19.04.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993252
Date:23.04.2003
Language:FR
[2003/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:A23G1/21, A23G1/28, B29C41/14, B29C41/42, B29C41/46
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM TAUCHFORMEN FÜR DIVERSE WERKSTÜCKE[2000/16]
English:METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR DIP MOULDING VARIOUS PIECES[2000/16]
French:PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION POUR LE MOULAGE PAR TREMPAGE DE PIECES DIVERSES[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2000National basic fee paid 
17.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
16.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2003Fee for grant paid
01.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[YD]FR2604651  (RICHARD FRERES STE CIVILE [FR]) [YD] 1,6 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2638632  (DANIEL GLAZER) [Y] 1,6 * column W *;
 [A]GB2078155  (BAKER PERKINS HOLDINGS LTD);
 [A]DE722924  (ALFRED WINKLER, et al)