Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1003837

EP1003837 - COMPOSITION FOR PRESERVING PREDETERMINED AND REPRODUCIBLE AMOUNTS OF MICRO-ORGANISMS, AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INSTITUT PASTEUR DE LILLE
1, rue du Professeur Calmette BP 245
59019 Lille Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
INSTITUT PASTEUR DE LILLE
1, rue du Professeur Calmette BP 245
59019 Lille Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / HERNANDEZ, Jean-François
4, rue des Clochettes
F-59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR
02 / PALUSZKIEWICZ, Fabrice
33, rue de la Givérol Anne de la Bourdonnage
F-59000 Lille / FR
03 / OUDART, Eric
42, avenue Bailly Ducroquet
F-59130 Lambersart / FR
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Martin, Jean-Jacques , et al
Cabinet Régimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Martin, Jean-Jacques , et al
Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98933707.624.06.1998
[2000/22]
WO1998FR01335
Priority number, dateFR1997000795425.06.1997         Original published format: FR 9707954
[2000/22]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900485
Date:07.01.1999
Language:FR
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1003837
Date:31.05.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1003837
Date:11.06.2003
Language:FR
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/04, C12N11/02
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR QUANTITATIVEN UND REPRODUZIERBAREN KONSERVIERUNG VON MICROORGANISMEN UND HERSTELLUNSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2000/22]
English:COMPOSITION FOR PRESERVING PREDETERMINED AND REPRODUCIBLE AMOUNTS OF MICRO-ORGANISMS, AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING SAME[2000/22]
French:COMPOSITION POUR LA CONSERVATION DE QUANTITES DETERMINEES ET REPRODUCTIBLES DE MICRO-ORGANISMES, ET PROCEDE D'OBTENTION[2000/22]
Entry into regional phase25.01.2000National basic fee paid 
25.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
30.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2003Fee for grant paid
14.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
IE11.06.2003
IT11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
CY24.06.2003
LU24.06.2003
CH30.06.2003
LI30.06.2003
MC30.06.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2005/02]AT11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
IE11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
CY24.06.2003
LU24.06.2003
CH30.06.2003
LI30.06.2003
MC30.06.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/39]AT11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
IE11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
CY24.06.2003
LU24.06.2003
CH30.06.2003
LI30.06.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/36]AT11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
IE11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
CY24.06.2003
CH30.06.2003
LI30.06.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/33]AT11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
IE11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
CH30.06.2003
LI30.06.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/15]AT11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
IE11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/10]AT11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
SE11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/05]AT11.06.2003
FI11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/03]AT11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/02]NL11.06.2003
GR11.09.2003
PT11.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]US3567585  (BLOCH HUBERT, et al) [A] 1,2,5,8,12,14-16 * column 1, line 20 - line 42 * * column 3, line 18 - line 67 *;
 [A]US5545555  (RACIOPPI STEPHEN G [US], et al) [A] 1-5,8 * column 4, line 10 - line 59 *;
 [A]EP0346545  (ALLELIX INC [CA]) [A] 1,4 * page 2, line 9 - line 55 *;
 [A]EP0515237  (TEXEL SOC [FR]) [A] 1,6 * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 54 *;
 [A]EP0569623  (LAUER ECKHARD [DE]) [A] 1,5 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 14 *