Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993340

EP0993340 - VIBRATORY CONE MILL EQUIPPED WITH FEEDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/16]DEVICE FOR FEEDING A MATERIAL TREATING PLANT AND VIBRATORY MILL EQUIPPED WITH SAME
[2003/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.05.2005  [2005/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solios Carbone
32, rue Fleury Neuvesel
69700 Givors / FR
For all designated states
FCB Ciment
50 rue de Ticléni
59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR
[2004/35]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
F C B
38, rue de la République
93100 Montreuil Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / ANDRE, Jean-François
Chemin des Vernes
F-38200 Villette de Vienne / FR
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Duthoit, Michel Georges André
Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés
96/98, Boulevard Carnot
B.P. 105
59027 Lille Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Duthoit, Michel
Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 19, Square Dutilleul BP 105
59027 Lille Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date98933725.826.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998FR01354
Priority number, dateFR1997000845830.06.1997         Original published format: FR 9708458
[2000/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9901222
Date:14.01.1999
Language:FR
[1999/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993340
Date:19.04.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993340
Date:12.05.2004
Language:FR
[2004/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B02C2/00, B02C23/02
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:VIBRATIONS-KEGELBRECHER MIT ZUFÜHRVORRICHTUNG[2003/48]
English:VIBRATORY CONE MILL EQUIPPED WITH FEEDING DEVICE[2003/48]
French:BROYEUR VIBRANT A CONE VERTICAL EQUIPE D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION[2003/48]
Former [2000/16]ZUFÜHRVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE MATERIALBEHANDLUNGSANLAGE UND VERTIKALER VIBRATIONS-KEGELBRECHER MIT EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG
Former [2000/16]DEVICE FOR FEEDING A MATERIAL TREATING PLANT AND VIBRATORY MILL EQUIPPED WITH SAME
Former [2000/16]DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION D'INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DE MATIERE ET BROYEUR VIBRANT A CONE VERTICAL EQUIPE D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF
Entry into regional phase21.12.1999National basic fee paid 
21.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
27.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2004Fee for grant paid
02.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
17.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XAY]SU1726016  ;
 [XAY]US3813046  (KEMNITZ R, et al) [X] 1,3 * column W * [A] 2,4-7 [Y] 8-11;
 [XAY]SU1228896  ;
 [XAY]SU274636  ;
 [Y]WO9641680  (FCB [FR], et al) [Y] 8-11 * abstract *
 [XAY]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, (19930428), vol. 93, no. 10, Database accession no. 93-084913, XP002057887 & SU1726016 A 19920415 (VNI PI MEKH OBRABOTKI) [X] 1,3 * abstract * [A] 2,4-7 [Y] 8-11
 [XAY]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, (19861231), vol. 86, no. 52, Database accession no. 86-345160, XP002057888 & SU1228896 A 19860507 (VNII NERUDNYKH STR MATERIALOV) [X] 1,3 * abstract * [A] 2,4-7 [Y] 8-11
 [XAY]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, (19930224), vol. 93, no. 01, Database accession no. 93-006800, XP002057889 & SU274636 A 19920307 (IVACHEV L M) [X] 1,3 * abstract * [A] 2,4-7 [Y] 8-11