blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0992161 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0992161



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 135
28.02.2003 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
28.02.2003 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
28.02.2003 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
22.11.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.11.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.11.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.11.2002 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
12.11.2002 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
02.11.2002 Withdrawal of application Opposition 1
30.10.2002 Withdrawal of application Opposition 1
11.07.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
11.07.2002 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.06.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
12.06.2002 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
12.06.2002 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
06.06.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 13
06.06.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
06.06.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
06.06.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
05.06.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
26.07.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.05.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.05.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
21.05.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
18.05.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 4
21.02.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
06.02.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.11.2000 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
06.11.2000 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
06.11.2000 Text intended for grant Search / examination 11
01.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.01.2000 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
27.01.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
24.01.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
16.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
25.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 14
29.12.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 10
29.12.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 12