blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0992161


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.02.2003 Revocation of patent published on  16.04.2003  [2003/16]
07.11.2002 Observations of proprietor on opposition
07.11.2002 Revocation of patent
08.07.2002 Observations of proprietor on opposition
14.06.2002 Opposition filed published on  31.07.2002  [2002/31]
10.06.2002 Unpublished change to opponent data
20.07.2001 (Expected) grant published on  05.09.2001 [2001/36]
11.07.2001 Renewal fee
29.05.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.02.2001 Communication of intention to grant
16.02.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.11.2000 First examination report
31.10.2000 Communication of intention to grant
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
25.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
08.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.2000 Renewal fee
08.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
12.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
15.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
02.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication