blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0992161
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0992161Global Dossier 05.09.2001B1
EP0992161 12.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
FR9801365 26.06.1998
FR9708104 27.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69801583T 27.06.2002T2
DE69801583D 11.10.2001D1
Priority number Date
FR9801365 26.06.1998
FR9708104 27.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9900987Global Dossier 07.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
FR9708104 27.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2163874T 01.02.2002T3
Priority number Date
FR9708104 27.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2765441 13.12.2002B1
FR2765441 31.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
FR9708104 27.06.1997